Molen v. United States 9th District Court et al
Plaintiff: James O. Molen
Defendant: United States 9th District Court, Maryann Matherly, Troy L. Nunley, Morrison C. England, Jr. and Kendall J. Newman
Case Number: 2:2017cv02224
Filed: October 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/9/2018 DENYING 22 Motion requesting issuance of a summons and for the matter to be set for a scheduling conference. (Zignago, K.)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/20/2018 ORDERING that this appeal is not taken in good faith; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this order on the Pro Se Unit at the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Fabillaran, J)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/5/2018; District Judge Troy L. Nunley recused. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings. (Zignago, K.)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/1/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. (York, M)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/15/2017 RECOMMENDING that this case be dismissed. Objections due within 20 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Hunt, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molen v. United States 9th District Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O. Molen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States 9th District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryann Matherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy L. Nunley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison C. England, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall J. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?