Rankins v. Garrett et al
Plaintiff: |
Norman Rankins |
Defendant: |
D. Garrett and P. Lelis |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv02235 |
Filed: |
October 25, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 6, 2018 |
Filing
21
ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/6/2018 ORDERING the custodian to produce Norman Rankins V-71789, to testify in USDC at 9:00 a.m. on 7/2/2018, before Magistrate Judge Kendall J . Newman, to appear by video-conferencing; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Warden, and fax a copy to the Litigation Coordinator. (cc: I.T. Dept.) (Yin, K)
|
March 7, 2018 |
Filing
15
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to sch edule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Christopher Becker. (cc: Christopher Becker) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/07/18. (Plummer, M)
|
December 13, 2017 |
Filing
9
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/13/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Norman Rankins. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
|
November 6, 2017 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/06/17 ORDERING plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the clerk of the court, or the required fees in the amount o9f $400.00. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?