Prater v. Cit Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Prater
Defendant: Cit Bank, N.A., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02248
Filed: October 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., with Prejudice 26 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/13/2018. Plaintiff Jerry Prater and Defendant Experian shall each bear their own costs and attorneys fees. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER dismissing Cit Bank, N.A. 19 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/6/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER re continuance 17 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/2/2018: The hearing on 4 , 5 Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike is reset for 4/30/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtr oom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Scheduling Conference is reset for 6/4/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Joint Status Report filing deadline is continued to 5/21/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER 15 for continuance signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/15/2017 resetting hearing on 4 Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing's Motion to Dismiss and 5 Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing's Motion to Stri ke for 2/20/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Scheduling Conference is reset for 4/9/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 3/26/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER 11 extending time for defendant to respond to initial complaint by 12/26/2017, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez for Senior Judge William B Shubb on 12/11/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER 7 extending time to respond to Initial Complaint by 12/11/2017, signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/22/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prater v. Cit Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cit Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Merrit Marie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Prater
Represented By: Clark Ovruchesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?