Humes v. Olson

Plaintiff: Jon Humes
Defendant: Tracie Olson
Case Number: 2:2017cv02327
Filed: November 7, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/14/18 DENYING 20 , 21 plaintiff's motions to dismiss the filing fee and for funds to conduct discovery. (Plummer, M)
January 29, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/29/18 ORDERING within 30 days from the date of service of this order, plaintiff may file a second amended complaint. The amended complaint must comply with this order and the 12/28/17 screening order 12 . The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the prisoner complaint form used in this district. (Plummer, M)
December 28, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/27/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jon Humes. The Sheriff of Sacramento County shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: Financial Department)(Henshaw, R)
December 7, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/6/2017 VACATING 4 Findings and Recommendations and DISMISSING the 1 Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days of service of this order. Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days of service of this order, an application in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. (York, M)
November 14, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/13/2017 ORDERING Clerk of Court to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action and RECOMMENDING 1 Complaint be dismissed without leave to amend. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humes v. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Humes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracie Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?