Larson v. Butte County Sheriff Department et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Larson
Defendant: Butte County Sheriff Department, Medical Staff of Butte County Sheriff Department, Andrea Thompson and Jed Colvin
Case Number: 2:2017cv02337
Filed: November 8, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/9/2018 DISMISSING plaintiff's amended complaint and GRANTING plaintiff 30 days to file a second amended complaint. The clerk shall send plaintiff the form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. (Yin, K)
December 14, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/14/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Jail Account of Daniel Larson. The Sheriff of Butte County shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
November 14, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/14/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. Butte County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butte County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff of Butte County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jed Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?