Thompson v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al.

Plaintiff: Randall Thompson
Defendant: California Department Corrections and Rehab, Thomas Bzoskie, Harry Newman and Theodore Abreu
Case Number: 2:2017cv02347
Filed: November 8, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2018 139 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/31/2018 ORDERING defendants Harry Newman, Theodore Abreu and Thomas Bzoskie DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). (Zignago, K.)
June 19, 2018 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/19/2018 GRANTING 129 defendants' request; the CDCR official with settlement authority for this action may participate in the June 27 settlement conference by telephone; and that official must be available throughout the settlement conference proceedings, beginning at 10:00 AM, until their conclusion. (Reader, L)
May 10, 2018 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/10/18 ORDERING the court REMOVES the case from VDRP, and REFERS this case to a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes, on 6/27/18 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #27 on the 8th Fl. Confidential Settlement conference statements are due by 6/20/18, and shall be emailed to: dborders@caed.uscourts.gov. Parties are also directed to file a "Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Statement" See L.R. 270(d). (Becknal, R)
December 22, 2017 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/22/2017 ORDERING this action is STAYED and all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED. The parties are directed to promptly meet and confer to discuss settlement of this action. If the parties have not been able to informally reach a settlement within 45 days, the parties shall initiate participation in the court's Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program by contacting the court's VDRP administrator. No later than fourteen (14) days after completion of the VDRP session, the parties shall jointly file their VDRP Completion Report. CASE STAYED. (Zignago, K.)
November 9, 2017 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/8/2017. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department Corrections and Rehab
Represented By: Michael Anthony Terhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bzoskie
Represented By: Shanan L. Hewitt
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Newman
Represented By: Shanan L. Hewitt
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Abreu
Represented By: Michael Anthony Terhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Thompson
Represented By: Eugene B. Chittock
Represented By: Bret Dennis Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?