Ayobi v. Espinosa
Petitioner: Shajia Ayobi
Respondent: Espinosa
Case Number: 2:2017cv02349
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/25/18signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/25/18 ORDERING that the Clerk of Court shall, on the docket in this case, correct the spelling of respondents name to Espinoza. Also, RECOMMENDING that respondent's motion to dismiss 19 be granted; and petitioner's second amended petition for writ of habeas corpus filed pursuant to 28 USC 2254 14 be dismissed as untimely. MOTION to DISMISS 19 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/9/2018 DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a district judge to this action and to send petitioner a blank form for pursuing a habeas corpus action, and RECOMMENDIN G petitioner's 10 request to stay this action be granted under the standards and procedures set forth in Kelly v. Small, 315 F.3d 1063 (9th Cir. 2003). Assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/10/18 GRANTING 7 Motion to Proceed IFP and DENYING 8 Motion to Stay and abey this action. Petitioner shall, within thirty days after service of this order, file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus on the form provided herewith and subject to the requirements set forth herein; petitioner may attach pertinent exhibits or request that the court electronically attach the exhibits she included with her original petition. Petitioner may also, within thirty days after service of this order, file a renewed request to stay and abey this action pending the exhaustion of her unexhausted claim(s) in the California Supreme Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to send petitioner, together with a copy of this order:(1) the courts form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254,and (2) a complete copy of the original petition 1 . (Plummer, M) Modified on 1/10/2018 (Plummer, M).
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/15/17 DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP with leave to file a new application, on the form provided herewith, within thirty days after service of this order. Petitioners petition for a writ of hab eas corpus is dismissed with leave to file an amended petition, on the form provided herewith, within thirty days after service of this order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner, together with a copy of this order,the courts forms for requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, and for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. (Plummer, M) Modified on 11/16/2017 (Plummer, M).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayobi v. Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shajia Ayobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?