Stanfield v. Muniz

Petitioner: Earl Richard Stanfield, Jr.
Respondent: William Muniz
Case Number: 2:2017cv02352
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/25/2018 DISMISSING this action pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) and the Clerk shall close this file. CASE CLOSED.(Yin, K)
April 24, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/23/2018 ORDERING Petitioner to SHOW CAUSE within 30 days of this Order why his failure to file his Opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition as ordered should not be deemed a waiver of any opposition to the granting of the motion or he shall file an opposition. (Henshaw, R)
November 17, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/16/2017 DISMISSING 1 Petition for Writ of Coram Nobis with leave to amend to file a habeas corpus petition within 60 days of the issuance of this Order. If petitioner elects to file habeas corpus petition, shall also submit an affidavit to support request to proceed IFP or appropriate filing fee within 30 days from the date of this Order. (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanfield v. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Earl Richard Stanfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?