Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Lisa Edna Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv02359
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/2/2018 EXTENDING Time through 8/7/2018 for Defendant to file its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (York, M)
July 17, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/17/18, GRANTING defendant a second extension of time of 15 days to file her motion for summary judgment; the new due date is 7/31/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
June 18, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/18/18 ORDERING that the new due date for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is Monday, 7/16/18. (Becknal, R)
March 28, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/27/2018 GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension to file a MSJ/Remand. Plaintiff shall file her MSJ/Remand by 5/14/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
November 15, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/15/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the scheduling order in social security cases. The C lerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. Within fourteen days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. (cc: USM) (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Edna Johnson
Represented By: Langley Ellen Kreuze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?