Grimes v. Grossjan
Plaintiff: Joseph Grimes
Defendant: M. Grossjan
Case Number: 2:2017cv02394
Filed: November 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/13/2019 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/2/19 ORDERING that 21 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are ADOPTED in full; Defendant CMF is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice; Plaintiff's claims for due process and equal protection are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice; 19 Motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED as moot and this case shall proceed as set forth in the magistrate judge's orders granting Plaintiff leave to amend on his remaining claims. (Kaminski, H)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/5/2018 GRANTING 26 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order in which to file an amended complaint. No further extension of time will be granted for this purpose. (Huang, H)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/12/18 GRANTING 24 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to file an amended complaint. (Coll, A)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/18/2018 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Joseph Grimes. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 07/31/18 VACATING 16 the Findings and Recommendations. Within 30 days of the filed date of this order, plaintiff shall file with the court a signed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintif f should note that he does not need to include a copy of his trust fund account statement. That statement has already been provided to the court. 5 Plaintiff also does not need to have an officer sign the certificate regarding the amount currently in his account. The only thing the court requires is a completed and signed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner. The Clerk of the Court shall provide plaintiff with a copy of the Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner.(Plummer, M)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 07/12/18 RECOMMENDING that this case be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute and comply with court orders. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/2/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute and comply with court orders. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/5/2018 ORDERING Clerk of Court to assign a district judge to this case and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/16/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a signed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court,or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. (Hunt, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Grossjan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Grossjan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?