Thao v. Superior Court of California County of Sacramento
Petitioner: Tou Christmas Thao
Respondent: Superior Court of California County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2017cv02396
Filed: November 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/20/2019 ORDERING, within 30 days, petitioner shall file a response to respondent's 11 motion to dismiss. (Yin, K)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/14/2018 ORDERING petitioner shall submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form. (Yin, K)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/22/2017 DIRECTING petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee. (York, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thao v. Superior Court of California County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tou Christmas Thao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superior Court of California County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?