Gifford v. Kampa et al
Plaintiff: Roger Gifford
Defendant: Peter Kampa, Robert Puckett, Sr., Patricia Slote, Melissa Tulledo, Robert Winston, Julie Bowles, Clint Dingman, Ernest Goff, Kevin Dixon, Hornbrook Community Services District, Hornbrook Community Bible Church Inc., Steven Crittenden, Duke Martin and James Soares
Case Number: 2:2017cv02421
Filed: November 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Siskiyou
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/4/2021 ORDERING on the Court's own motion, the hearing re 76 Motion set for 6/16/2021, in Redding, California, at 10:00 a.m., is VACATED. The Court will address Plaintiff's motion by separate order. (Zignago, K.)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/25/21 RECOMMENDING that 24 Defendant Winston's motion to dismiss be granted as to Plaintiff's federal claims and Defendant Winston be dismissed with prejudice. The HCSD Defendants' 26 amended motion to dismiss be granted as to Plaintiff's federal claims. Defendants' motions to dismiss be denied as to Plaintiff's state law claims, without prejudice to renewal upon the filing of a fu rther amended complaint. Defendant Winston's 25 motion to strike Plaintiff's state law claims and 39 motion to revoke Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status, declare Plaintiff a vexatious litigant, and require Plaintiff to post sec urity also be denied without prejudice to renewal upon the filing of a further amended complaint. Plaintiff's 65 , 66 motions for default judgment be denied because Plaintiff has not demonstrated an entitlement to relief on any of his federa l claims and the Court has not decided whether to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims. Matter REFERRED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court.(Kastilahn, A)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/10/2021 RELATING cases 2:17-cv-02421-TLN-DMC and 2:21-cv-00119-JAM-AC. The action denominated 2:21-cv-00119-JAM-AC is REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be known as 2:21-cv-00119-TLN-DMC. (Zignago, K.)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/10/2019 ORDERING 24 , 26 Motions to Dismiss and 26 Motion for Order requiring plaintiff to post security submitted on the briefs without oral argument. The hearing in this matter set for 9/11/2019, shall be limited to arguments related to 25 Motion to Strike. (Huang, H)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting requests for telephonic appearances [Doc. 52 and 54] signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/6/2019. (Pine, C)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: On the court's own motion, the hearing on defendants' motions (ECF Nos. 24, 25, 26, and 39) currently set for 8/7/2019 is continued to September 11, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/6/2019. (Pine, C)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/13/19 CONTINUING the 7/10/19 hearing on 24 25 26 Motions to 8/7/19 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Coll, A)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/05/19 GRANTING IN PART 35 , 37 Motions for Extension of Time, construed as Requests for Continuance of the 06/12/19 motions hearing date. The hearing on the 24 Motion to Dismiss, 25 Motion to Strike and the 26 Amended Motion to Dismiss is RESET to 7/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiff's oppositions are due within the time provided by Local Rule230(c). (Benson, A.)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/23/2019 VACATING the scheduling conference set for 6/26/2019, pending resolution of 24 , 25 , and 26 Motions. (York, M)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/26/2019 DENYING 9 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to amend. (Reader, L)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/11/2019 DIRECTING the clerk to issue process. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the summons by indicating the addresses of the named defendants and shall submit t o the United States Marshal the required documents. Within 20 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a notice indicating that the documents described above have been submitted to the United States Marshal, or a notice that plaintiff int ends to serve the summons and complaint without assistance from the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than (60) days from the date of this order. (cc: USM) (Washington, S)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/13/18 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Plummer, M)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/20/17 ORDERING thatthe Clerk of Court shall REASSIGN the action to Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison in the Redding division of this district for purposes of all appropriate pre-trial proceedings and other magistrate judge duties, and shall appropriately re-designate the case; The action shall remain assigned to Judge Troy L. Nunley as district judge for all other purposes.(Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gifford v. Kampa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Kampa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Puckett, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Slote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Tulledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Dingman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornbrook Community Services District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornbrook Community Bible Church Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Soares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?