Shockency v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Josiah Chandler Shockency
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv02427
Filed: November 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Siskiyou
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/26/2019 AWARDING Attorney Fees. (York, M)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/25/19 GRANTING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. The matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order; and The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in Plaintiffs favor and close the case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/31/18 ORDERING the time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED from 6/4/18 to 7/5/18. (Becknal, R)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/16/2018 DIRECTING plaintiff to file a motion for summary judgment within 7 days of the date this order is served. The Commissioner's cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed 45 days thereafter. (York, M)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/20/2017 GRANTING 2 Request to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING the Clerk to issue process. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary service documents and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM are DIRECTED to serve process within 60 days without prepayment of costs. (Hunt, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shockency v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josiah Chandler Shockency
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?