Sekona v. Horowitz et al
Plaintiff: Etuate Sekona
Defendant: E. Horowitz, Joe A. Lizarraga, Medical Receiver and C.C. Healthcare Services
Case Number: 2:2017cv02479
Filed: November 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/16/20 ORDERING defendant shall file an answer to plaintiff's complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/6/20 ADOPTING 31 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 26 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's first claim of medical indifference relating to his 2014 concussion is dismissed with prejudice. This action shall proceed solely on the second claim that Defendant Dr. E. Horowitz denied plaintiff access to a cane or walker and further medical treatment. (Kaminski, H)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 08/31/20 RECOMMENDING that defendant's motion to dismiss 26 be granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's first claim of medical indifference relating to his 2014 concussion be dismissed with prejudice; and this action be allowed to proceed solely on the second claim that Dr. E. Horowitz denied plaintiff access to a cane or walker and further medical treatment. Motion to Dismiss 26 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/13/2020 DENYING plaintiff's 24 motion for entry of default. (Yin, K)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/02/20 DENYING 21 , 22 plaintiff's motions seeking an order directing defendants to respond to plaintiff's complaint. (Plummer, M)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/10/19 ADOPTING the findings and recommendations filed 5/15/19, in full; DISMISSING Plaintiff's claims against defendants Joe A. Lizarraga, Medical Receiver, and C.C. Healthcare Services; and DIRECTING the Clerk to terminate Joe A. Lizarraga, Medical Receiver, and C.C. Healthcare Services as defendants to this action. (Becknal, R)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/15/2019 RECOMMENDING Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Joe A. Lizarraga, Medical Receiver, and C.C. Healthcare Services be dismissed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/19/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff may file a first amended complaint within 30 days of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/13/18 granting 2 , 7 , and 10 Motions to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made fro m Prison Account of Etuate Sejona. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial) (Plummer, M)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/27/2017. New Case Number 2:17-cv-2479-CMK(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sekona v. Horowitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etuate Sekona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe A. Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Receiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C. Healthcare Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?