Ford Motor Company v. Navex Trading Company, Inc. d/b/a New Autos Inc.
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
Defendant: Navex Trading Company, Inc. and Navex Trading Company, Inc. Doing business as New Autos Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02481
Filed: November 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M Kellison
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to the #16 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice filed 6/20/2018, THIS ACTION IS TERMINATED, and all pending dates and deadlines are VACATED. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 21, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Ford Motor Company. (Bush, Tamara)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATUS PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/21/2018 ORDERING the court hereby VACATES the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference scheduled for 3/26/2018; Initial Disclosures required by FRCP 26(a)(1) by 3/28/2018; Expert testimony intended solely for rebuttal, those experts shall be disclosed and reports by 11/23/2018; Discovery due by 12/15/2018; Dispositive Motions filed by 1/30/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; and Jury Trial set for 6/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; this case is not related to any other cases in this district; However, a case is currently pending in the USDC Eastern District of Michigan which was filed by Ford against the original purchaser of the subject vehicle, John Cena; that action is pending as Ford v. Cena, USDC E.D. Mich., 2:17-CV-13876 AJT DRG. (Reader, L) Modified on 3/22/2018 (Reader, L).
March 19, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 3/26/2018 Scheduling Conference hearing re #13 Status Report by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bush, Tamara) Modified on 3/20/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
March 8, 2018 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ford Motor Company. (Bush, Tamara)
January 12, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER by Navex Trading Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McLeod, Brady) Modified on 1/16/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
December 14, 2017 Filing 11 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond to #1 Complaint by Navex Trading Company, Inc. Attorney McLeod, Brady D. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof Of Service Stipulation To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint)(McLeod, Brady)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER vacating the hearing and briefing schedule for preliminary injunction motion #9 signed by District Judge John A. Mendez for Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/6/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 1, 2017 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Vacate Hearing and Briefing Schedule for Preliminary Injunction Motion by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bush, Tamara) Modified on 12/18/2017 (Zignago, K.).
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/27/2017: IT IS ORDERED that #3 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any motion for a preliminary injunction by 12/1/2017. Defendant's opposition shall be filed by 12/8/2017. Any reply shall be filed by 12/12/2017. The court will hold oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on 12/14/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 27, 2017 Filing 7 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 11/27/2017 re #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Court ORDERS said motion DENIED. Court sets hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 12/14/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Said motion to be filed by 12/1/2017. Defendant's response is due by 12/8/2017. Plaintiff's reply is due by 12/12/2017. Plaintiff's Counsel Tamara Bush present. Defendant's Counsel Brady McCloud present. [Plaintiff shall serve a copy of these minutes on counsel for defendant, Mr. McCloud.] Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 27, 2017 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The parties are hereby notified that #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is hereby set for hearing on 11/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The parties are granted leave to appear by telephone. The courtroom deputy shall email the parties with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. [The parties shall provide the clerk with an email address forthwith to: kkirkseysmith@caed.uscourts.gov.] (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 27, 2017 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Becknal, R)
November 27, 2017 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Navex Trading Company, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tamara A. Bush* *Dykema Gossett LLP* *333 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2100* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Becknal, R)
November 22, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration Lisa Brown, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Declaration Lance Mosley, #7 TRO Checklist)(Bush, Tamara) Modified on 11/27/2017 (Becknal, R).
November 22, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ford Motor Company (Bush, Tamara)
November 22, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Navex Trading Company, Inc. d/b/a New Autos Inc. by Ford Motor Company. Attorney Bush, Tamara A. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7379661) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2, Order Confirmation, #3 Exhibit 3, Screenshot of Website Post)(Bush, Tamara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford Motor Company v. Navex Trading Company, Inc. d/b/a New Autos Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Tamara A. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navex Trading Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navex Trading Company, Inc. Doing business as New Autos Inc.
Represented By: Brady D. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?