Campbell et al v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: |
Danielle Lynne Campbell and K. D. C. |
Defendant: |
Commissioner of Social Security |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv02501 |
Filed: |
November 29, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Shasta |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Nature of Suit: |
Supplemental Security Income |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 405 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 17, 2019 |
Filing
25
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/17/19 GRANTING in part 22 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees and expenses in the total amount of $4,274.32. If the government determines that Plaintiff does not owe a federal debt that qualifies for offset, payment may be made in the name of Plaintiff's Counsel. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
March 11, 2019 |
Filing
20
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/11/19 REVERSING the final decision of the Commissioner of Social Security and REMANDING to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings. The Clerk shall enter a fina l judgment in favor of plaintiff and against defendant, except that the court retains jurisdiction for the limited purpose of supervising payment of plaintiff's counsel's sanctions as 18 ordered to be paid on 03/07/19. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
|
March 7, 2019 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/7/19 ORDERING that Within 21 days of this order, plaintiff's counsel shall personally pay a total of $500.00 in monetary sanctions to the Clerk of Court based on his failure to comply with court orders. Plaintiff's counsel shall not attempt to recover such sanctions from his client, whether directly or indirectly; Failure to timely pay the sanctions may result in dismissal of the action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Proc edure 41(b); and Plaintiff's counsel shall promptly serve a copy of this order on his client, and within seven (7) days of this order, shall file on the court's docket a declaration of service under penalty of perjury. (cc Financial ) (Becknal, R)
|
February 6, 2019 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/6/19. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is deemed filed. Plaintiff's counsel is sanctioned $250.00 for failure to comply with the court's scheduling order, payable to the Clerk of Court within 21 days. Plaintiff's counsel shall not attempt to collect such sanctions, directly or indirectly, from his client.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
January 14, 2019 |
Filing
13
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/14/19 ORDERING that, within 21 days, plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why plaintiff should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with the court's scheduling order. Within 21 days, plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment and/or remand. (Benson, A.)
|
January 2, 2018 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/2/2018 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and ORDERING the Clerk to issue process. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM all necessary documents to effectuate service on the defendant. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process no later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Becknal, R) (
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?