Humes v. Brown
Plaintiff: Jon Humes
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Case Number: 2:2017cv02503
Filed: November 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/02/19 GRANTING 27 Motion to withdraw first amended complaint; VACATING 22 the 7/08/19 order; STRIKING 19 THE 10/31/18 first amended complaint; GRANTING 28 plaintiff's motion to am end. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a new amended complaint or, in the alternative, shall identify which amended complaint he intended to pursue in this action 26 or 28 at 3-7. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff the form for filing a civil rights action. (Plummer, M)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/17/19 VACATING 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and GRANTING 20 Motion to Amend. (Plummer, M)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jon Humes signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/18/18. The sheriff of Sacramento County shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Sacramento County. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Plummer, M)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/14/2018 ORDERING plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a completed affidavit to proceed ifp ; the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement.Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice.(Yin, K)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/7/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the required fees of $400.00. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humes v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Humes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?