Daly v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brian Matthew Daly
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv02519
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/13/19 DENYING 18 motion for summary judgment and GRANTING 19 cross-motion for summary judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment for defendant. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/19/18, ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension of 30 days, through 7/11/2018, to file the Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kastilahn, A)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/4/2018 GRANTING Plaintiff an extension of time to file a Motion for Summary Judgment; MSJ due 6/11/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/4/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's 3 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve scheduling order in social security cases. Within fourteen days, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daly v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Matthew Daly
Represented By: Joseph Clayton Fraulob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?