Johnson v. Kernan et al
Petitioner: Jerry C. Johnson
Respondent: Scott Kernan and Shawn Hatton
Case Number: 2:2017cv02525
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/16/2020 DENYING 57 Motion for Court Order. (Henshaw, R)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/30/20 DENYING 50 Motion for Sanctions and DENYING 53 Motion for a court order. (Plummer, M)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/04/19 GRANTING 38 Motion to supplement petition. Respondent is directed to file a response to petitioners habeas petition 1 , as supplemented 38 , within 60 days from the date of this order. Also, DENYING 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel and DENYING 43 petitioners request to reconsider the denial of his motion for sanctions and for injunctive relief. (Plummer, M)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/18/2019 DENYING petitioner's 37 motion for extension of time and DENYING petitioner's 39 Motion for sanctions and injunctive relief, without prejudice to petitioner pursuing his cl aims in a separate civil rights action under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Respondent's 40 request for clarification is GRANTED and within 14 days, petitioner must advise the court whether he intends to file an amended petition or whether his intenti on was to supplement the original petition with the arguments in his motion to amend. Respondent's 40 request for a briefing schedule is GRANTED to the extent a briefing schedule will be set up on resolution of the status of petition. (Yin, K)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/8/2019 VACATING respondent's 22 motion to dismiss and DENYING as moot petitioner's 23 motion for a stay. Within 30 days, petitioner may file an amended petition. If petitioner fails to file an amended petition, the case will proceed on the original petition. (Yin, K)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/20/18 ORDERING petitioners motion for a court order 32 is construed as a motion for leaveto file a supplemental reply in support of his motion to stay. Petitioners motion for leave to file a supplemental reply is granted and petitioner shallhave twenty-one days from service of this order to file a supplemental reply. (Plummer, M)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/9/2018 ORDERING Respondent to file an opposition or notice of non-opposition to 23 Motion for Stay and Abeyance within 30 days from the date of this order; DENYING without prejudice 24 Request for Appointment of Counsel; ORDERING Petitioner to file an opposition or notice of non-opposition to 22 Motion to Dismiss within 30 days of service of this order. If petitioner exhausts any claims in the California Supreme Court prior to this courts resolution of the pending motion, petitioner shall file a notice of exhaustion in this court. (Henshaw, R)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/11/2018 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's 17 request for appointment of counsel.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kernan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerry C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn Hatton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?