Cherveny v. Arnold

Petitioner: Michael Lawrence Cherveny
Respondent: Eric Arnold
Case Number: 2:2017cv02528
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/20/2018 DISMISSING this action without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
July 3, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/3/2018 ORDERING that 10 Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. (Fabillaran, J)
June 12, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/12/2018 DIRECTING petitioner to file proof that he has filed his petition with the CA Supreme Court or show cause why he has not done so within 14 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
April 20, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/20/2018 ADOPTING 8 Findings and Recommendations. Petitioner's 5 Motion for Stay and Abeyance is GRANTED. Petitioner shall file a writ of habeas corpus with the California Supreme Court within 45 days of the issuance of this Order. CASE STAYED. (Zignago, K.)
March 1, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 03/01/18 ORDERING the clerk shall assign a District Judge to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that Petitioners Motion for Stay and Abeyance be granted. Motion to Stay 5 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
January 23, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/23/2018 ORDERING Petitioner to, within 30 days of the date of this Order, explain why the state supreme court habeas petition referred to in this Order does not constitute exhaustion. (Henshaw, R)
December 14, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/13/2017 DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to send petitioner a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. Petitioner shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application and a certified copy of his prison trust account statement or submit the filing fee required by the court. (York, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherveny v. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Lawrence Cherveny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?