Rumantsev v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Vyacheslav Rumantsev
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv02539
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/5/2018 ORDERING that the time for responding to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 9/11/2018. (Zignago, K.)
August 31, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/31/2018 GRANTING Defendant's extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment from August 31, 2018 to September 4, 2018. (Cannarozzi, N) (Main Document 20 replaced on 8/31/2018) (Cannarozzi, N).
August 20, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/20/18: The time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be extended from August 17, 2018 to August 31, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
July 10, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/09/18 ORDERING that the date for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 08/17/18. (Benson, A.)
June 15, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/14/2018 GRANTING an Extension of Time for Plaintiff to file a Motion for Summary Judgment. The 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed on 6/11/2018 is deemed timely filed.(Hunt, G)
May 31, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/31/18 ORDERING plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment brief is EXTENDED to 6/8/18. (Becknal, R)
December 7, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/6/2017 GRANTING 3 Request to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING the Clerk to issue process. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary service documents and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM are DIRECTED to serve process within 60 days without pre-payment of costs. (Hunt, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rumantsev v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vyacheslav Rumantsev
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?