Oganesyan v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Zhanna Oganesyan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv02541
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/02/18 ORDERING that the time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 07/05/18.(Benson, A.)
June 27, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/27/18: The time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be extended from June 25, 2018 to June 28, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
May 31, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/30/18 ORDERING that the time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED from 5/24/18 to 6/25/18. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oganesyan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhanna Oganesyan
Represented By: Stuart T. Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?