Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Defendant: Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr. and Robert P David
Case Number: 2:2017cv02573
Filed: December 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/4/2020 ORDERING that Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's 70 opposition to the motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than 5/19/2020. Defendant may file a reply to Plaintiff's reply no later than 6/10/2020. (Zignago, K.)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING ECF NO. 68 signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/20/2020. Good cause having been shown, and in accordance with the stipulation of the parties, the Court here by ORDERS that: 1. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 64) shall be filed no later than April 27, 2020; 2. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed no later than fifteen days after Defendant's response is filed; and3. Defendant may file a reply no later than fifteen days after Plaintiff's reply is filed. (Deutsch, S)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/10/2020 ORDERING plaintiff's 59 Objections are SUSTAINED. Plaintiff shall file its motion for summary judgment within 30 days of the order. California shall file its response within 45 days after Plaintiff's motion is filed. Plaintiff may file a reply within 15 days after California's response is filed, and California may file a reply within 15 days of Plaintiff's reply. (Zignago, K.)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/30/19 DENYING 43 Motion to Dismiss and GRANTING 43 Request for Judicial Notice. (Coll, A)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDED ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/26/18 GRANTING 39 Request to Seal. The Court's previous Order 46 shall be re-filed under seal. (Kaminski, H)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/11/2018 IT IS SO ORDERED Defendants' motion to dismiss and memorandum shall be filed no later than 10/24/2018, its memorandum shall be no longer than 30 pages; Plaintiff's opposition by 11/16/2018, memorandum no longer than 30 pages; Defendants' reply by 12/6/2018, and no longer than 20 pages; the hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss shall be 12/13/2018, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (Reader, L)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/28/18 GRANTING 19 Motion to Dismiss: The Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety, but PhRMA is granted leave to amend the Complaint not later than thirty (30) days following the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed. (Kaminski, H)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/16/2018 GRANTING leave to file a response to 27 Sur-reply of no more than 3 pages. Defendant must file within 5 days. (Fabillaran, J)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/4/2018 GRANTING 25 Application for Leave to File Sur-Reply. (Washington, S)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/22/2018 ORDERING Defendants' initial memorandum of points and authorities in support of the motion to dismiss complaint shall be filed no later than 1/26/2018, and be no longer in leng th than 30 pages; Plaintiff's opposition memorandum shall be filed no later than 2/26/2018, and be no longer in length than 30 pages; Defendants' reply memorandum shall be filed no later than 3/26/2018, and be no longer in length than 20 pages; and the hearing shall be 4/19/2018. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Represented By: Annie Smith Amaral
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Handwerker, PHV
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones, PHV
Represented By: Robert N. Weiner, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Selma Michele Inan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P David
Represented By: Selma Michele Inan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?