Bailey v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Todd Bailey
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2017cv02577
Filed: December 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING 5 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in Full signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/7/2018 DISMISSING this matter without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Fabillaran, J)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/11/2018 ORDERING Clerk of Court to randomly assign a U.S. District Judge to this action and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Assigned and referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/12/18 ORDERING plaintiff's "complaint of crimes" request 1 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a complaint. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff the court's form for filing a civil rights action and the application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?