Vasquez v. Frauenheim
Petitioner: Salvador Benjamin Vasquez
Respondent: Scott Frauenheim
Case Number: 2:2017cv02579
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/5/2018 GRANTING petitioner's 7 motion to proceed IFP and petitioner's 2 motion for a stay and abeyance. Within thirty days from the date the California Supreme Court issues a final order resolving petitioner's unexhausted claims, petitioner is directed to file in this court a motion to lift the stay and motion to amend, as set forth in this order. The Clerk shall administratively terminate this action. (Yin, K)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/13/2017 ORDERING Petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the appropriate filing fee. (Henshaw, R)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez v. Frauenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Salvador Benjamin Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Frauenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?