Henry v. Angelini Pharms, Inc., et al.,

Plaintiff: Toby Henry
Defendant: Angelini Pharma Inc., Angelini, Angelini Labopharm LLC, Endo, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Gruppo Angelini, Labopharm Inc., Labopharm USA Inc., Paladin Labs Inc. and TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02593
Filed: December 11, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/12/18, ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before 3/15/2018. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's forthcoming amended complaint no later than 14 days after its filing. (Kastilahn, A)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/13/18, ORDERING that Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., are GRANTED a second extension of 27 days to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than 3/12/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/12/2018 GRANTING an Extension of Time for defendant to respond to the complaint to 3/12/2018. (Hunt, G)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/31/18, ORDERING that Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., may have an extension of 28 days, until 2/13/2018, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/22/2018 GRANTING an Extension of Time for Defendant Pharma to file its response to the Complaint until 3/12/2018. (Hunt, G)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 01/18/18 ORDERING that, pursuant to 11 Stipulation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 02/13/18. (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Angelini Pharms, Inc., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelini Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Robert Paul Merten, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelini
Represented By: Robert Paul Merten, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelini Labopharm LLC
Represented By: Robert Paul Merten, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gruppo Angelini
Represented By: Robert Paul Merten, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labopharm Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labopharm USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paladin Labs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Henry
Represented By: Lawrence Steven Paikoff
Represented By: Richard Jacob Paikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?