Humes v. Sessions
Plaintiff: Jon Humes
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Case Number: 2:2017cv02608
Filed: December 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/4/2020 DENYING plaintiff's 22 motion. Plaintiff is hereby informed that the court will not respond to future filings in this action that are not authorized by the Fed.R.Civ.P or the Fed.R.A.P. (Yin, K)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/18/19 ADOPTING 19 Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED, without leave to amend, for failure to state a cognizable claim. CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/08/19 ORDERING the Clerk of Court shall randomly assign a United States District Judge to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's first amended complaint be dismissed without leave to amend for failure to state a cognizable claim. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/1/2019 DENYING plaintiff's 14 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Jail Trust Account of Jon Humes signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/19/2019. The Sheriff shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forwa rd to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Sacramento County. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial) (Yin, K)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/5/2018 DIRECTING to plaintiff to submit the required trust account statement within 30 days from the date of the service of this order. (Fabillaran, J)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/18/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of service of this order, either the filing fee or the application required by § 1915(a). (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humes v. Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Humes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?