Goins v. Bobbla et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Lee Goins
Defendant: P. Bobbla, A. Dimaculangan, Glenn Sturges and John Macial
Case Number: 2:2018cv00034
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SECOND AMENDED SUPERSEDING ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/13/2019 ORDERING the custodian to produce Raymond Lee Goins P-54383 before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes, to appe ar by video-conferencing at CSP-LAC on 3/4/2019, at 12:00 p.m.; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; this second amended superseding Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum supersedes and deems null and void both prior Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandums filed on 1/28/2019 and 1/14/2019. (cc: DB, I.T Dept.) (Yin, K)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/01/19 ORDERING the clerk of the court shall send to plaintiff 1 blank summons, 1 USM-285 form, instruction sheet, and a copy of the amended complaint filed 5/25/18 to be completed and returned within 60 days. (Plummer, M)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/28/2019 ORDERING the custodian to produce Raymond Lee Goins before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes, to appear by video-conferencing at CSP-LAC on 3/4/2019 at 12:00 p.m.; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: DB, I.T.) (Yin, K)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/14/19 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Raymond Lee Goins on 2/21/19 at 10:00a.m. in courtroom 27 before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: DB and OTCD) (Plummer, M)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/11/2018 DENYING plaintiff's request for a copy of the document represented by docket entries 20 and 21; and DENYING plaintiff's request that the court not hold a settlement conference in this action until all defendants are served. (Yin, K)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/28/18 ADOPTING 17 Findings and Recommendations in full. A. Dimaculangan (Registered Nurse) terminated. (Coll, A)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/15/2018. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assig ned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Christopher Becker. (cc: Christopher Becker) (Yin, K)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/22/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 13 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Raymond Lee Goins signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/20/18. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goins v. Bobbla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Lee Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Bobbla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Dimaculangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Sturges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Macial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?