McCarty v. Kernan

Petitioner: Kenneth Gerald McCarty
Respondent: Scott Kernan
Case Number: 2:2018cv00037
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/11/2018 DENYING without prejudice 12 Motion to Stay. Petitioner granted 30 days to file a motion for stay as stated in this order. (Henshaw, R)
March 1, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/01/18 ORDERING Petitioner is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner show cause, within thirty days, why his application for a writ of habeas corpus should not be dismissed for failure to exhaust state remedies. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of these findings and recommendations together with a copy of the petition filed in the instant case on the Attorney General of the State of California. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Attorney General)(Plummer, M)
January 19, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/19/2018 ORDERING Petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the appropriate filing fee. If Petitioner intended his filing for the CA Supreme Court, he may file a request to voluntarily dismiss this action. (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarty v. Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Gerald McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?