Bailey v. Enloe Medical Center

Plaintiff: Dan Bailey
Defendant: Enloe Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2018cv00055
Filed: January 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/20/2019 MODIFYING of the schedule for this case as follows: Discovery shall be completed by 7/26/2019, and all Pretrial Motions shall be heard by 9/20/2019. 24 Motion for a Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff's video recording device may be used to record the witness's testimony alone. The video recording must stop during all breaks, whenever testimony stops, whenever the parties go off the record, and whenever the of ficial recording is stopped. The video recording device must be stationary, adjacent to, and near the official recording device, with the focus on the witness only. The video recording is not official and may not be introduced as evidence or cited as evidence and may only be used for plaintiff's own personal purposes related to the prosecution of this case and his own education. The parties are to coordinate with the Court to schedule a time for Plaintiff's deposition when Judge Cota w ill be available on-call. If any part unilaterally stops the deposition without calling the Court, that party may be subject to sanctions. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to forward to Defendant the court's consent form and Defendant shall complete and file the consent election form within 30 days of the date of this order. (Huang, H)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/14/2019 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 18 Motion for an Order re Terms and Conditions of Plaintiff's Deposition. Defendant may depose plaintiff for a total of 10 hours over 2 consecutive or non-consecutive days and plaintiff may independently record the deposition proceedings, but no such recording may be offered into evidence or cited as evidence for any purpose at any stage of this litigation. (Henshaw, R)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/15/2018 ORDERING the parties to exchange lists of expert witnesses no later that 1/07/2019; Discovery shall be completed, and all discovery related motions shall be noticed to be heard, by 3/18/2019; All other pre-trial motions, including dispositive motions, shall be noticed to be heard by 5/06/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Jury Trial set for 9/23/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller.(Fabillaran, J)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/30/18: Pro Se Plaintiff Dan Bailey is permitted to use electronic filing via the Court's Case Management/Electronic Case Files system. (Kaminski, H)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/18/2018 ORDERING that the Status/Scheduling Conference SET for 6/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. The parties shall submit to the court and serve by mail on all other parties, no later than 7 days before the conference, a status/scheduling report. (Hunt, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Enloe Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Bailey
Represented By: Krista Carol Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enloe Medical Center
Represented By: Barbara Allyn Blackburn
Represented By: Douglas L. Ropel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?