Gray v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: George Ellis Gray
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv00071
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/28/2018 RECOMMENDING that the action be dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(b), The Clerk of Court be directed to vacate all dates and close this case.REASSIGNING CASE to District Judge John A. Mendez. New Case Number: 2:18-CV-71 JAM KJN PS; Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections within 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
August 30, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/30/18, ORDERING that no later than 9/14/2018 plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed based on plaintiff's failure to prosecut e this case. No later than 9/14/2018, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal (USM) the documents required for services and file a statement with the court that such documents have been submitted to the USM. No later than 9/14/2018, plai ntiff shall file a brief statement indicating whether or not he consents to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge. The Clerk shall serve another copy of the court's 1/19/2018 orders and the summons (ECF Nos. 3 , 4 , and 5 ) on plaintiff along with a copy of this order.(Kastilahn, A)
January 19, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/19/18, ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Service of process is appropriate for the Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk is directed t o serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal (USM). Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the U SM the required documents for service, and file a statement with the court that such documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (cc: USM) (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Ellis Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?