Bohnel et al v. Jetblue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: Ericka Bohnel and Rosa Martinez
Defendant: Jetblue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00081
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/10/2020 AMENDING the scheduling order as follows: Fact Discovery Cutoff - 4/30/2021; Expert Disclosures - 6/1/2021; Expert Rebuttals - 6/21/2021; Expert Discovery Cutoff - 7/19/2021; Deadline to Mediate - 8/9/2021; Dispositive Motions Filed - 8/9/2021; Pretrial Conference 1/18/2022 at 1:30 PM; and Trial 3/29/2022 at 9:00 AM. (Becknal, R)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/6/2020 CONTINUING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE: Fact Discovery Cutoff 11/2/2020; Expert Disclosures 10/1/2020; Expert Rebuttals 11/2/2020; Expert Discovery Cutoff 12/1/2020; Deadline to Mediate 12/11/2020. Plaintiff's 34 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, currently scheduled for 5/4/2020 is hereby taken off-calendar. (York, M)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/20/19 ORDERING that Fact Discovery cut-off is March 31, 2020. Expert reports due August 3, 2020. Rebuttal expert reports due September 1, 2020. Expert Discovery cut-off is November 2, 2020. Deadline to mediate is December 1, 2020. Deadline to file dispositive motions is January 4, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial set for 6/2/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/7/19 GRANTING 24 Motion to Continue. MODIFYING the Scheduling Order as follows: Fact Discovery completion by 12/30/19. Expert witness disclosure by 6/8/2020. Rebuttal witness disclosure by 7/6/ 2020 Discovery completion deadline 8/3/2020. Dispositive Motion deadline 9/14/2020. The Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 10/26/2020 at 01:30 PM. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 1/20/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/6/2018. (Washington, S) Modified on 12/6/2018 (Washington, S).
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER for continuance 9 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/26/2018 resetting the Scheduling Conference 8/27/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 8/13/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohnel et al v. Jetblue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericka Bohnel
Represented By: Glenn Guenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Martinez
Represented By: Glenn Guenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetblue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Shelley G. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?