Taylor v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Joe Taylor
Defendant: J. Lewis, J. Ma, M. Bobbala and P. Sahota
Case Number: 2:2018cv00149
Filed: January 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 7/19/21 RECOMMENDING that defendant's motion for summary judgment 38 be granted. Motion for Summary Judgment 38 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/9/2021 GRANTING 37 Second Motion to Modify nunc pro tunc to 3/1/2021. Discovery is closed. Dispositive motions to be filed and served on or before 4/5/2021. (Henshaw, R)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/30/2020 GRANTING 35 Motion. Dispositive motions to be filed on or before 3/1/2021. (Henshaw, R)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 09/14/20 GRANTING 30 Defendant's application. The September 30, 2020 discovery cut-off deadline carries the same meaning as the discovery cut-off in the scheduling and discovery order. Discovery shall be served by September 30, 2020. Modification of the scheduling order is unnecessary. (Plummer, M)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 7/31/20 GRANTING 28 application for extension of time. The Court resets the discovery cut-off date to September 30, 2020. Any motions to compel shall be filed within sixty days of September 30, 20 20, and any dispositive motions within ninety days of September 30, 2020. Further, the deposition may be taken via video conference, if necessary, with the Plaintiff, the deposition reporter, and defense counsel in separate locations and such deposition testimony shall be admissible.(Plummer, M)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/18/2019 ADOPTING 17 Findings and Recommendations in full and DISMISSING Defendants Lewis, Bobbala, Sahota, and Chaiken. This action proceeds on plaintiff's 12 First Amended Complaint against defendant Ma only. (York, M)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/03/19 RECOMMENDING that defendants Lewis, Bobbala, Sahota, and Chaiken be dismissed. This action proceed on plaintiffs first amended complaint against defendant Ma only. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/20/2019 ORDERING Clerk of Court to randomly assign a District Judge and update the docket to reflect the new case number. This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:18-cv-0149 JAM DMC (PC). (Henshaw, R)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 08/16/19 ORDERING that plaintiff may file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/18/2019 DISMISSING 1 Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/13/18 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Joe Taylor. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bobbala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Sahota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?