(PS) Altstatt et al v. City of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Daniel James Altstatt and Kim Eileen Glazzard
Defendant: Superior Court of the State of California, Sacramento County, Robert C. Hight, Julia Mason, Kevin Culhane, Adrian Carpenter, The City of Sacramento, Aaron Israel, Shawn Bartosh, Howard Chan, Kip Procter, Matthew Ruyak, Robert Rose, Ricardo Vargas, Jerry Brown, Larry Eccleston, Linda Douglas, Chad Eggen, James Sanchez, Jose Mendez, Beau Parkhurst and City of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2018cv00150
Filed: January 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 100 USCA MANDATE as to #88 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. The appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. (Coll, A)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JUDGMENT dated *11/9/18* pursuant to order signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/8/18. (Coll, A)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/8/18 ADOPTING #92 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING #97 Motion for Judgment. This action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction and for failure to comply with the court's order. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
November 9, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #98 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and #99 Judgment served on Daniel James Altstatt and Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Coll, A)
September 4, 2018 Filing 97 MOTION for JUDGMENT by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (York, M)
September 4, 2018 Filing 96 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #92 by Plaintiffs Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard . (York, M)
August 23, 2018 Filing 93 USCA ORDER - A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with rule); see also WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (en banc) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction.(Becknal, R)
August 23, 2018 Filing 92 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/22/2018 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed, without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Zignago, K.)
August 23, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #92 Findings and Recommendations served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Zignago, K.)
August 20, 2018 Filing 95 RESPONSE to ORDER to SHOW CAUSE #91 by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Reader, L)
August 20, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE of claim by Daniel James Altstatt (Reader, L)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/06/18 ORDERING plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE by 08/20/18 why they have not filed an amended complaint. The filing of an amended complaint will discharge this order. (Benson, A.)
August 6, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #91 Order to Show Cause served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Benson, A.)
July 31, 2018 Filing 90 USCA CASE NUMBER 18-16422 for #88 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Kim Eileen Glazzard, Daniel James Altstatt. (York, M)
July 30, 2018 Filing 89 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #88 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Kim Eileen Glazzard, Daniel James Altstatt. Notice of Appeal filed *7/25/2018*, Complaint filed *1/23/2018* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *7/3/2018*. ** *Fee Status: Paid on 7/25/2018 in the amount of $1010.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Reader, L)
July 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #89 Appeal Processed to USCA, served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Reader, L)
July 25, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard as to #85 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (Reader, L)
July 25, 2018 RECEIPT number #CAE200091582 $1010.00 for 2 Appeal Fees fbo Kim Glazzard by Kim Glazzard on 7/25/2018. (Reader, L)
July 23, 2018 Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER: Text Only re #7 . The Initial Scheduling Conference currently set on Wednesday July 25, 2018 is hereby vacated from the calendar and will be reset if it becomes necessary. (Callen, V)
July 23, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 87 Minute Order served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Callen, V)
July 3, 2018 Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) re #85 Order, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Findings and Recommendations (Order). "Pursuant to the court's order at ECF No. 85, plaintiffs' complaint has been dismissed with partial leave to amend. The amended complaint shall be filed on or before August 2, 2018." (Callen, V)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/2/18 adopting #75 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Motions to Dismiss #9 , #21 , #24 , #46 and #48 are GRANTED. (Kaminski, H)
July 3, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 86 Minute Order, served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Callen, V)
June 29, 2018 Filing 84 RESPONSE by Jerry Brown to #79 Objections to Findings and Recommendations. (Gonzalez, Alberto)
June 27, 2018 Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) re #81 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Jerry Brown's motion (ECF No. 81) for a three day extension of time to respond to plaintiff's objections to this court's findings and recommendations is GRANTED for good cause shown. (Callen, V)
June 27, 2018 Filing 82 REPLY by Kip Procter to Plaintiff's opposition to #75 Findings and Recommendations. (Egan, Christopher) Modified on 6/27/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 27, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 83 Minute Order, served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Callen, V)
June 26, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION for 3-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations re #75 by Jerry Brown. (Gonzalez, Alberto) Modified on 6/27/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 20, 2018 Filing 80 RESPONSE by Kevin Culhane, Robert C. Hight, Superior Court of the State of California, Sacramento County to #79 Objections to Findings and Recommendations. (Konz, Derick)
June 11, 2018 Filing 79 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #75 by Plaintiffs Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Zignago, K.)
May 30, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Refusal by Daniel James Altstatt re #74 Order. (Kaminski, H)
May 30, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Refusal by Daniel James Altstatt re #75 Findings and Recommendations. (Kaminski, H)
May 30, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Refusal by Kim Eileen Glazzard re #74 Order, #75 Findings and Recommendations. (Kaminski, H)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/18/2018 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motions at ECF Nos. #3 , #55 , #61 and #67 are DENIED; Further, IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Motions #9 , #21 , #24 , #46 , and #48 are REFERRED to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections are due within 21 days after being served with these F & R's.(Reader, L)
May 21, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #75 Order and Findings and Recommendations, served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Reader, L)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/17/2018 ORDERING that Plaintiff's #3 , #55 , #61 and #67 motions are DENIED. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Hon. Kevin Culhane, Hon. Robert C. Hight, and the Supereior Court of the State of California's #21 motion to dismiss be granted and all claims against them be dismissed with prejudice. Defendant Gov. Jerry Brown's #24 motion to dismiss be granted and all claims against him be dismissed with prejudice. The State Employee Defendants' #48 motion to dismiss be granted and all claims be dismissed against them. State claims should be dismissed with prejudice, and federal claims (the Fifth, Eighth, and Ninth causes of action) should be dismissed with leave to amend as to any conduct occurring on or after 1/23/2016. The City of Sacramento's #9 motion to dismiss be granted and all claims against the city dismissed, with limited leave to amend on plaintiffs' Third, Fourth, Fifth, Eighth and Ninth causes of action for conduct occurring on or after 1/23/2016. Kip Proctor's #46 motion to dismiss be granted and all claims against him be dismissed with leave to amend, subject to the applicable statute of limitations (conduct occurring on or after 1/23/2016 for personal injury, 1/23/2015 for trespass, and 1/23/2017 for defamation). Motions referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Zignago, K.)
May 17, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #74 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Zignago, K.)
April 25, 2018 Filing 73 REPLY by Kip Procter to #70 Opposition to #46 Motion to Dismiss. (Egan, Christopher)
April 24, 2018 Filing 72 REPLY by Shawn Bartosh, Adrian Carpenter, Howard Chan, City of Sacramento, Linda Douglas, Larry Eccleston, Chad Eggen, Aaron Israel, Julia Mason, Jose Mendez, Beau Parkhurst, Robert Rose, Matthew Ruyak, James Sanchez, Ricardo Vargas to #9 and #48 Motions to Dismiss. (Bickel, Melissa)
April 24, 2018 Filing 71 REPLY by Kevin Culhane, Robert C. Hight, Superior Court of the State of California, Sacramento County to RESPONSE to #21 Motion to Dismiss. (Konz, Derick)
April 18, 2018 Filing 70 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard to #46 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Benson, A.)
April 17, 2018 Filing 69 RESPONSE by Daniel James Altstatt to #48 Motion to Dismiss. (Fabillaran, J)
April 17, 2018 Filing 68 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Fabillaran, J)
April 4, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES by Daniel James Altstatt. (Kaminski, H)
April 4, 2018 Filing 66 OBJECTIONS to motion to remand and strike by Plaintiff Daniel James Altstatt. (Kaminski, H)
April 4, 2018 Filing 65 THIRD NOTICE of OBJECTIONS by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard to jurisdiction of Magistrate to hear any Motions or determine any issues before the Court. (Washington, S)
April 3, 2018 Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) re #21 Motion to Dismiss, #24 Motion to Dismiss, #9 Motion to Dismiss, #48 Motion to Dismiss, #46 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants have filed separate motions to dismiss, ECF Nos. 9, 21, 24, 46, and 48. Upon review of the record, the court finds no hearing is necessary and orders that the motions will be heard on the papers. See Local Rule 230(g). The hearing previously set for April 18, 2018 is hereby VACATED. Plaintiffs have already responded to the motions to dismiss at ECF Nos. 9, 21, and 24. No further responses to these motions will be considered. Plaintiffs' responses to the motions at ECF Nos. 46 and 48 shall be filed on or before April 18, 2018. Defendants' optional reply briefs as to all pending motions to dismiss shall be filed on or before April 25, 2018. The motions will be deemed submitted as of April 25, 2018. (Callen, V)
April 3, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 64 Minute Order,,, served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Callen, V)
March 29, 2018 Filing 63 SUPPLEMENT TO RESPONSE by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard to #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 29, 2018 Filing 59 JOINDER by Linda Douglas in re #48 Motion to Dismiss. (Bickel, Melissa) Modified on 4/2/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 28, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs to #24 Motion to Dismiss. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 28, 2018 Filing 61 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs to advancement of hearing 49 and MOTION to reset hearing. (Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 4/3/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 28, 2018 Filing 60 RESPONSE by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard to #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 27, 2018 Filing 58 SECOND NOTICE of OBJECTIONS by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard to jurisdiction of Magistrate to hear any Motions or determine any issues before the Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 27, 2018 Filing 57 RESPONSE by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard to #22 Motion to Dismiss. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 27, 2018 Filing 56 RESPONSE by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard to #21 Motion to Dismiss. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 27, 2018 Filing 55 VERIFIED CRIMINAL INFORMATION and EXPARTE MOTION for Order to Show Cause why sanctions for criminal contempt should not issue by Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 27, 2018 Filing 54 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ricardo Vargas served on 3/23/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 27, 2018 Filing 53 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Julia Mason served on 3/27/2018.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 27, 2018 Filing 52 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Robert Rose served on 3/23/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 27, 2018 Filing 51 JOINDER by Julia Mason in re #48 MOTION to DISMISS. (Bickel, Melissa) Modified on 4/2/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 27, 2018 Filing 50 WITHDRAWAL of #22 Motion to Dismiss by Julia Mason. (Bickel, Melissa)
March 26, 2018 Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only). re #48 Motion to Dismiss. SET/RESET MOTION HEARING. In order to maintain efficiency the Motion filed 3/26/2018 with the hearing date of 5/2/2018 is herby advanced to 4/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. If the parties have any questions or concerns please contact the Court Clerk at (916) 930-4199. (Callen, V) (Callen, V)
March 26, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION to DISMISS by Defendants. Attorney Bickel, Melissa D. added. Motion Hearing SET for 5/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order)(Bickel, Melissa) Modified on 3/30/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 26, 2018 Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only). re #46 Motion to Dismiss. SET/RESET MOTION HEARING. In order to maintain efficiency the Motion filed 3/26/2018 with the hearing date of 5/2/2018 is herby advanced to 4/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. If the parties have any questions or concerns please contact the Court Clerk at (916) 930-4199. (Callen, V)
March 26, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION to DISMISS by Kip Procter. Attorney Egan, Christopher Michael added. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Ps&As, #2 Proposed Order)(Egan, Christopher)
March 26, 2018 Filing 45 WITHDRAWAL of #22 Motion to Dismiss by Shawn Bartosh, Howard Chan, Larry Eccleston, Aaron Israel, Jose Mendez, Matthew Ruyak, Ricardo Vargas. (Bickel, Melissa)
March 26, 2018 Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only). re #21 Motion to Dismiss, #24 Motion to Dismiss, #22 Motion to Dismiss, #9 Motion to Dismiss. Due to the Court's schedule the Motions currently set on 4/11/2018 are hereby continued to 4/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. If the parties have any questions or concerns please contact the Court Clerk at (916) 930-4199 for assistance. (Callen, V)
March 26, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 44 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing, served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Callen, V)
March 26, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 47 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing, served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Callen, V)
March 26, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 49 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing, served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Callen, V)
March 22, 2018 Filing 43 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: James Sanchez served on 3/19/2018. (York, M)
March 22, 2018 Filing 42 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Adrian Carpenter served on 3/11/2018. (York, M)
March 22, 2018 Filing 41 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Beau Parkhurst served on 3/10/2018. (York, M)
March 22, 2018 Filing 40 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Matthew Ruyak served on 3/11/2018. (York, M)
March 22, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Aaron Israel served on 3/11/2018. (York, M)
March 22, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Shawn Bartosh served on 3/15/2018. (York, M)
March 22, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Howard Chan served on 3/15/2018. (York, M)
March 22, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Linda Douglas served on 3/19/2018. (York, M)
March 15, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jose Mendez served on 3/14/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/14/2018 DENYING as moot Plaintiffs' #33 Motion for Extension of Time. (Zignago, K.)
March 14, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #34 Order served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Zignago, K.)
March 13, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond re #24 Motion to Dismiss by Daniel James Altstatt. (Fabillaran, J)
March 12, 2018 Filing 32 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Daniel James Altstatt. (Fabillaran, J)
March 12, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Shawn Bartosh served on 3/11/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
March 12, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Larry Eccleston served on 3/11/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
March 12, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Howard Chan served on 3/11/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
March 9, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Robert C. Hight served on 3/7/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
March 9, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kevin Culhane served on 2/23/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
March 9, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Chad Eggen served on 3/4/2018; Robert C. Hight served on 3/4/2018; Kip Procter served on 3/4/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
March 8, 2018 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) re #21 Motion to Dismiss, #22 Motion to Dismiss, #9 Motion to Dismiss. In order to maintain efficiency the previously filed motions currently set on March 28, 2018, ECF No. 9, ECF No.21 and ECF No.22 are hereby continued to Wednesday, April 11, 2018 at 10:00 along with Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF.24. (Callen, V)
March 8, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 25 Minute Order, served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Callen, V)
March 7, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to DISMISS by Jerry Brown. Attorney Gonzalez, Alberto L. added. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Gonzalez, Alberto)
February 26, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE of MOTION HEARING re #9 Motion to Dismiss by City of Sacramento. Hearing set for 3/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire (Bickel, Melissa) Modified on 2/26/2018 (Reader, L).
February 23, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to DISMISS Complaint for insufficiency of service of process by Shawn Bartosh, Howard Chan, Larry Eccleston, Aaron Israel, Julia Mason, Jose Mendez, Matthew Ruyak, Ricardo Vargas. Attorney Bickel, Melissa D added. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibits A - H)(Bickel, Melissa) Modified on 2/26/2018 (Reader, L).
February 22, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to DISMISS by Kevin Culhane, Robert C. Hight, Superior Court of the State of California, Sacramento County. Attorney Konz, Derick E. added. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Konz, Derick) Modified on 2/22/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
February 21, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jose Mendez served on 2/14/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Shawn Bartosh served on 2/14/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Julia Mason served on 2/14/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Howard Chan served on 2/14/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ricardo Vargas served on 2/14/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jerry Brown served on 2/14/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Superior Court of the State of California, Sacramento County served on 2/14/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Larry Eccleston served on 2/14/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: City of Sacramento served on 2/1/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Matthew Ruyak served on 2/2/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Aaron Israel served on 2/2/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by City of Sacramento. Attorney Bickel, Melissa D added. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bickel, Melissa) Modified on 2/23/2018 (Benson, A.).
January 23, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. 2, is DENIED. Plaintiffs have not shown that they have given proper notice to Defendants under Local Rule 231 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b). Plaintiffs have not pleaded specific facts that show an immediate irreparable harm. If Plaintiffs intend to seek a preliminary injunction, such a motion must be filed in accordance with Local Rule 231(d) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a) and must be noticed for an available calendar date. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
January 23, 2018 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 7/25/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Robert Rose, Matthew Ruyak, James Sanchez, Superior Court of the State of California, Sacramento County, The City of Sacramento, Ricardo Vargas* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Daniel James Altstatt* *c/o DJA Trust and KEG Trust* *P.O. Box 19736* *Sacramento CA 95819*. (Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Robert C. Hight, Aaron Israel, Julia Mason, Jose Mendez, Beau Parkhurst, Kip Procter* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Daniel James Altstatt* *c/o DJA Trust and KEG Trust* *P.O. Box 19736* *Sacramento CA 95819*. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 1/23/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
January 23, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Shawn Bartosh, Jerry Brown, Adrian Carpenter, Howard Chan, Kevin Culhane, Linda Douglas, Larry Eccleston, Chad Eggen* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Daniel James Altstatt* *c/o DJA Trust and KEG Trust* *P.O. Box 19736* *Sacramento, CA 95819*. (Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for preliminary judicial determination by Daniel James Altstatt, and im Eileen Glazzard. (Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Daniel James Altstatt, and Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 TRO Checklist)(Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kim Eileen Glazzard, and Daniel James Altstatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2018 RECEIPT number #CAE200087531 $400.00 fbo Daniel James Altstatt, et al., by Daniel James Altstatt on 1/23/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2018 SERVICE IN PERSON : #6 Summons, #4 Summons, #7 Civil New Case Documents for JAM, #5 Summons, served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Minute Order served on Daniel James Altstatt, Kim Eileen Glazzard. (Donati, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Altstatt et al v. City of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of the State of California, Sacramento County
Represented By: Derick E. Konz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Hight
Represented By: Derick E. Konz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Mason
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Culhane
Represented By: Derick E. Konz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Carpenter
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Israel
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Bartosh
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Chan
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Procter
Represented By: Charles M.B. Gnekow
Represented By: Christopher Michael Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ruyak
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rose
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Vargas
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Alberto L. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Eccleston
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Douglas
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Eggen
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sanchez
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Mendez
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beau Parkhurst
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel James Altstatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Eileen Glazzard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?