Jenkins v. Sacramento County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Jamal A. Jenkins
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department, Scott Jones, Eric Maness and Ralph Diaz
Case Number: 2:2018cv00204
Filed: January 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/15/2018 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed and the Clerk of Court be directed to close this case; ORDERING that all pleading, discovery, and motion practice in this action are STAYED pending resolution of the findings and recommendations. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. CASE STAYED. (Hunt, G)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/14/2018 DIRECTING plaintiff to pay the Clerk of Court, within 21 days of this order, $100.00 in monetary sanctions for failure to comply with the court's orders. Within 21 days of this order, plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why this action should not be dismissed with prejudice. Within 21 days of this order, plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint in compliance with the court's April 3, 2018 order. Alternatively, and in lieu of paying the monetary sanctions, responding to the order to show cause, and filing a first amended complaint, plaintiff may instead file a notice of voluntary dismissal of the action without prejudice within 21 days of this order. (York, M)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/3/2018 GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP; Plaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend; within 28 days of this order, plaintiff shall file either a first amended complaint in compliance with this order or a request for voluntary dismissal of the action without prejudice. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Sacramento County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Maness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?