Tomasini v. Chau et al
Plaintiff: Paul C. Tomasini
Defendant: James Chau, James Jackson, Christopher Smith, Jonathan Ashby, Darrel Hopkins, W. David Smiley, J. Lewis and D. Gentry
Case Number: 2:2018cv00286
Filed: February 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/15/2022 GRANTING plaintiff's 36 motion to dismiss. Defendant Dr. Darrel (or Darrell) Hopkins and the claim against him are DISMISSED without prejudice. (Yin, K)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/10/22 PARTIALLY GRANTING 28 Motion to file their responsive pleading and schedule end of discovery and pretrial motion due dates. Defendants response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before January 31, 2022. Once Defendants have filed their response, the Court will issue a discovery andscheduling order. (Plummer, M)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/08/21 GRANTING 24 Ex Parte Application for extension of time. Defendants have a thirty-dayextension of time to file any motion to opt out of the Post-Screening ADR Project. (Plummer, M)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/7/2021. Defendants shall file any motion to opt out of the Post-Screening ADR Project within 30 days. The parties shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the settlement conference in accordance with this order. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (Yin, K)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/12/19 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be collected in accordance with the court's CDC order filed concurrently herewith. Plaintiff's complaint 1 is dismissed with leave to amend. Within 30 days of the date of service of this order, plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/28/2019 DENYING plaintiff's 7 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomasini v. Chau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul C. Tomasini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Chau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. David Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?