Arzaga v. Santiago et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Jesus Arzaga
Defendant: E. Santiago, G. Donna, Haluik, A. Victoriano and S. Pak
Case Number: 2:2018cv00313
Filed: February 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/9/2019 RECOMMENDING 23 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's IFP Status be granted; 11 Plaintiff's IFP Status be revoked; and Plaintiff be ordered to pay the $40 0.00 filing fee within 21 days from the date the district court adopts the instant findings and recommendations and failure to timely pay the filing fee will result in the dismissal of this action. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/18/2018 VACATING the 11 findings and recommendations filed 11/14/2018 and DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the Notice of Amendment with the required documents. (Yin, K)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Daniel Jesus Arzaga signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/14/18. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/14/2018 DIRECTING the Clerk to assign a district judge to this case. Judge Kimberly J. Mueller assigned to this case. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Fabillaran, J)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/9/18. Old Case No. 1:18-cv-0185-BAM, New Case No. 2:18-cv-0313-KJN. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arzaga v. Santiago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jesus Arzaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Donna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haluik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Victoriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?