Mobile Hi-Tech Wheels v. TWM Wholesale, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mobile Hi-Tech Wheels
Defendant: TWM Wholesale, LLC, Tire & Wheel Master, Inc., Tire & Wheel Master, LLC, USA Wheel & Tire Outlet, Inc., Aslam Property, Inc., HB Commercial LLC, Nadeem Aslam and Ammad Hussain
Case Number: 2:2018cv00339
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/6/19 ORDERING that the case is stayed for 90 days. Plaintiff is allowed to file a First Amended Complaint during the pendency of the stay. Defendants' answer to the First Amended Complaint will not be due until 14 days after pendency of the stay. Plaintiff's Motion 18 , as well as Defendants' Motion 25 are both DENIED, without prejudice to refiling once the stay in this matter has been lifted. (Kaminski, H)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/28/2019 EXTENDING discovery dates as follows: Fact discovery to be completed by 5/30/2019; Designation of experts due 6/30/2019; Supplemental list of expert witnesses due 7/30/2019; Joint Notice of Trial Readiness (if the parties do not intend to file dispositive motions) due 8/30/2019; Dispositive motions deadline 8/30/2019. (Zignago, K.)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/30/2018 GRANTING 29 Notice of Request to Seal Documents. (Zignago, K.)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/29/2018 GRANTING 30 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Defendants Statement of Additional Undisputed Material F acts [ECF No. 28-1] is accepted as timely filed. On or before 12/18/2018, Plaintiff Mobile Hi-Tech Wheels may file an amended Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) and amended Evidentiary Objections to Defendants Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Henshaw, R)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/29/2018 GRANTING 22 Stipulated Request to extend briefing schedule re 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Opposition due 11/15/2018 and Reply due 11/29/2018. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile Hi-Tech Wheels v. TWM Wholesale, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWM Wholesale, LLC
Represented By: Brandon Claus Fernald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tire & Wheel Master, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Claus Fernald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tire & Wheel Master, LLC
Represented By: Brandon Claus Fernald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Wheel & Tire Outlet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aslam Property, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HB Commercial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadeem Aslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ammad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobile Hi-Tech Wheels
Represented By: Thomas J. Daly
Represented By: Steven Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?