USA v. Approximately $123,513.00 in Ownership Payouts from Yreka Junction Investors, LP et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $123,513.00 in Ownership Payouts from Yreka Junction Investors, LP, A 10% Ownership Share in Yreka Junction Investors, LP and Approximately $150,000 in Proceeds from the Sale of Real Property Located at 1358 Blue Oaks Boulevard, Roseville, California
Case Number: 2:2018cv00348
Filed: February 14, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT of FORFEITURE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 06/29/18. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
April 19, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 04/18/18. (Benson, A.)
March 8, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/7/18. (Kastilahn, A)
March 5, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/2/2018 for Clerk's Issuance of Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem. (Hunt, G)
February 20, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/20/18: This action is RELATED with member case 2:13-cr-00214 TLN and REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:18- cv-00348 TLN EFB. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approximately $123,513.00 in Ownership Payouts from Yreka Junction Investors, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $123,513.00 in Ownership Payouts from Yreka Junction Investors, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 10% Ownership Share in Yreka Junction Investors, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $150,000 in Proceeds from the Sale of Real Property Located at 1358 Blue Oaks Boulevard, Roseville, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?