American River Ag., Inc. v. Global Natural, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
American River Ag., Inc. |
Defendant: |
Global Natural, LLC and J. Michael Spangler |
Case Number: |
2:2018cv00377 |
Filed: |
February 16, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
El Dorado |
Presiding Judge: |
Carolyn K. Delaney |
Presiding Judge: |
Troy L. Nunley |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 28, 2020 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/27/2020 ADOPTING IN FULL 25 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING 18 Motion for Default Judgment; and ORDERING that: 1) Judgment is entered in Plaintiff's favor and against Defendants ; 2) Plaintiff is awarded $1,254,031.62 jointly and severally against Defendants Global Natural and Michael Spangler; 3) Plaintiff additionally is awarded $157,430.30 from Global Natural and $50,275.59 in prejudgment interest from Global Natural; and 4) Costs against Defendants are assessed in the amount of $659.96. CASE CLOSED. (Tupolo, A)
|
June 11, 2020 |
Filing
25
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/10/20 ORDERING that within five days of these findings and recommendations being filed, plaintiff shall serve a copy of the findings and recommendations on defendants by mail at the address where service of process was effected, or at any more recent address known to plaintiff, and shall file a proof of such service forthwith. RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's motion for default judgment [18 ] be GRANTED. Judgment be entered in plaintiff's favor and against defendants. Plaintiff be awarded $1,254,031.62 jointly and severally against defendants Global Natural and Michael Spangler. Plaintiff additionally be awarded $157, 430.30 from Global Natural and $50,275.59 in prejudgment interest from Global Natural. Costs against defendants be assessed in the amount of $659.96. F&R referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Kaminski, H)
|
April 14, 2020 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/14/2020 ORDERING that Defendants' opposition, or statement of non-opposition to 18 the Motion to Default Judgment, shall be filed no later than 4/29/2020. Plaintiffs reply brief, if any, shall be filed not later than 5/6/2020. Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this order on defendants at their last-known address(es) and file a proof of service within 7 days of the same. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 4/14/2020 (Krueger, M).
|
March 19, 2019 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/19/19 DENYING 14 Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice subject to renewal in a motion that addresses the appropriate legal standards. (Benson, A.)
|
November 13, 2018 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/13/2018 DENYING 9 Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice. (Huang, H)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?