Leskinen v. The United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Laura Leskinen
Defendant: The United States Department of Agriculture, Sonny Perdue, Christine Messer and Curt Stock
Case Number: 2:2018cv00453
Filed: March 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/7/2019 GRANTING 72 Motion for Extension Time until 11/25/2019, for Plaintiff to file her notice of appeal. (York, M)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/26/19 ADOPTING 65 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment is entered for Defendant and case closed. (Kaminski, H)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/21/2019 DENYING 56 Plaintiff's motion challenging the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, motion for further discovery 55 , and Motions to Strike [5 8], 59 , 60 , 61 , and 62 , RECOMMENDING 40 that motion for summary judgment be granted in full, judgment be entered for defendant, and the clerk of the court be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/15/19 GRANTING 52 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff shall file her opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment in compliance with the court's March 5, 2019 order no later than April 23, 2019. Defendant shall have until May 7, 2019, to file a reply brief. (Kaminski, H)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/5/19 ORDERING that 49 Plaintiff's objections are OVERRULED. The 3/28/19 hearing is VACATED, subject to potential rescheduling at a later juncture. Plaintiff's 48 , 50 opposition is STRICKEN. No later than 4/9/2019, plaintiff shall file an opposition that complies with all the requirements of Local Rule 260 and this courts page limits and any reply brief is due 4/23/2019. (Kastilahn, A)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/27/19 DENYING 45 Motion to exceed the page limit. Any pages of briefing exceeding the 20 page- limit will not be considered by the court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/15/19 GRANTING Plaintiff's 41 motion for an extension. The Motion for Summary Judgment hearing is CONTINUED to 3/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Any opposition to the motion shall be filed no later than 2/28/2019 and any reply brief is due 3/7/2019. (Kastilahn, A)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/2/2019 DENYING 29 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendant is afforded 21 days from the date of this Order to answer the 1 Complaint. (Huang, H)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/3/2018 IT IS SO ORDERED Because Plaintiff's Motion 29 seeks to enlarge the scope of the claims against the Secretary in the operative Complaint, continuing the Secretary's response to the Complaint until 21 days after the Court resolves Plaintiff's Motion will promote efficiency and conserve resources. (Reader, L)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 09/13/18 GRANTING IN PART 11 Motion to Dismiss; all claims and Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND, except Plaintiff's Title VII claim against Defendant Sonny Perdue, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the USDA, shall proceed; Defendant Perdue shall answer the complaint as narrowed within 21 days; DENYING 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Benson, A.)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/14/2018 ORDERING the hearing for 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is VACATED. Plaintiff's request for formal censure of defendants counsel is DENIED. All pleading, discovery, and motion practice in this action are STAYED pending resolution of the findings and recommendations. RECOMMENDING 11 Motion to Dismiss by Granted in Part. All claims and defendants be Dismissed without leave to Amend excep t that plaintiff's Title VII claim against defendant Sonny Perdue, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the USDA, be permitted to proceed. Defendant Perdue be required to answer the complaint. The 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be Denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Washington, S)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/5/18 DENYING 8 Motion to remove Magistrate Judge. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leskinen v. The United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Leskinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?