Bridgers v. Gastelo

Petitioner: Joseph L. Bridgers
Respondent: J. Gastelo
Case Number: 2:2018cv00481
Filed: March 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/3/2019 GRANTING 20 Motion for Extension Time to 6/14/2019, for Petitioner to file and serve his objections to 19 Findings and Recommendations. (York, M)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/19/19 RECOMMENDING that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied 1 . F&R referred to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/19/2018 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgers v. Gastelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph L. Bridgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Gastelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?