United States of America v. State of California et al Featured Case

The US Department of Justice filed this lawsuit against California over its "sanctuary state" policy. This step escalates the tensions between the Trump administration and state and local governments over the handling of immigration issues. The lawsuit also names California Governor Jerry Brown and Attorney General Xavier Becerra. The state recently passed three laws that the Trump administration alleges hinder federal enforcement of immigration laws and endanger federal agents.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: State of California, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr. and Xavier Becerra
Amicus: American Center for Law and Justice, State of Texas, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State Of Nevada, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of West Virginia, Phil Bryant and Paul Lepage
Case Number: 2:2018cv00490
Filed: March 6, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 214 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/18/2018 GRANTING 207 Motion to Stay Case; the parties shall file a joint status statement no later than ten days after the appeal to the Ninth Circuit becomes final; the statement shall include specific proposals as to how the parties wish to proceed with the case at bar in light of the Ninth Circuits order. [USCA #18-16496] (Reader, L)
October 18, 2018 213 NOTICE of filing second amended declaration of Cherokee Melton in opposition to 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Declaration of Cherokee Melton, # 2 Exhibit A-L, # 3 Exhibit M-P, # 4 Exhibit Q-S)(Melton, Cherokee) Modified on 10/22/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
October 16, 2018 212 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/15/18 GRANTING 211 Stipulated Request to Unseal Documents. Defendants to file a Second Amended Declaration of Cherokee Melton in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Exhibits M through S unsealed and redacted consistent with this order. (Kastilahn, A)
October 12, 2018 211 STIPULATION to UNSEAL DOCUMENTS by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Melton, Cherokee) Modified on 10/15/2018 (Benson, A.).
October 10, 2018 210 MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on the motion(s) now calendared for October 16, 2018 is/are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY)(Vine, H)
October 9, 2018 209 REPLY by United States of America to RESPONSE to 207 Motion to Stay. (Genova, Francesca)
October 2, 2018 208 OPPOSITION by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California to 207 Motion to Stay. (Chuang, Christine)
September 18, 2018 207 MOTION to STAY by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order)(Genova, Francesca) Modified on 9/19/2018 (Zignago, K.).
September 5, 2018 206 MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the parties joint status report 205 the Court orders the following: The United States shall file a motion to stay by September 18, 2018; Opposition shall be due by October 2, 2018; Reply shall be due by October 9, 2018; and Hearing on the motion shall be on October 16, 2018 at 1:30 p.m.(TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
September 4, 2018 205 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. (Chuang, Christine)
August 27, 2018 204 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel re Mollie M. Lee by City and County of San Francisco. Attorney Eisenberg, Sara added. (Eisenberg, Sara) Modified on 8/29/2018 (Zignago, K.).
August 9, 2018 203 USCA CASE NUMBER 18-16496 for 201 Notice of Appeal filed by United States of America. (York, M)
August 7, 2018 202 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re 201 Notice of Appeal filed by United States of America. Notice of Appeal filed *8/7/2018*, Complaint filed *3/6/2018* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *7/9/2018*. Court Reporter: *K. O'Halloran*. *Fee Status: Waived* (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information) (Zignago, K.)
August 7, 2018 201 NOTICE of APPEAL by United States of America as to 197 Order, 193 Order. (Genova, Francesca) Modified on 8/7/2018 (Zignago, K.).
August 1, 2018 200 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed the parties Joint Status Report. ECF No. 199. In light of the parties request, the Court will not set any further dates at this time. The parties are ORDERED to file an updated Joint Status Report with suggested dates and/or informing the Court how the parties believe litigation in this matter should proceed no later than September 4, 2018. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
July 31, 2018 199 JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Genova, Francesca)
July 23, 2018 198 ANSWER by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California.(Sherman, Lee)
July 9, 2018 197 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/9/2018 GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART 77 Motion to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS the 77 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Supremacy Clause claims against AB 103, SB 54, and California Labor Code Section 90.2 (added by AB 450) WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. The Court DENIES the 77 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Supremacy Clause claim with respect to California Government Code Sections 7285.1 and 7285.2 and California Labor Code Section 1019.2 (added by AB 450). Amended Joint Status Report due 7/31/2018. The parties should specifically address how they anticipate the case will proceed in this Court and suggest dates for discovery cut-off, expert witness disclosure, filing of dispositive motions, pretrial conference and trial. (Donati, J)
July 9, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 196 Minute Order served on Vadim Miesegaes. (Donati, J)
July 9, 2018 196 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Vadim S. Miesegaes Motion for Relief from Default. ECF No. 194. The Court has broad discretion in choosing whether to admit and consider amicus briefs. Miesegaes filed his brief well after the Courts deadline and after the point when it might have offered any assistance to the Court. Miesegaes Motion is DENIED. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
July 5, 2018 195 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Stacey Shelton for proceedings held on 6/20/18 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Kaminski, H)
July 5, 2018 193 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/4/2018 DENYING-IN-PART and GRANTING-IN-PART 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to enjoin California Government Code Sections 12532, 7284.6(a)(1)(C) & (D), and 7284.6(a)(4), and California Labor Code Section 90.2. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion and PRELIMINARILY ENJOINS the State of California, Governor Brown, and Attorney General Becerra from enforcing California Government Code Sections 7285.1 and 7285.2 and California Labor Code Section 1019.2(a)&(b) as applied to private employers. (Donati, J)
June 29, 2018 192 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by T. Peter Pierce for proceedings held on 6/20/2018 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Hunt, G)
June 29, 2018 191 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by PICO California for proceedings held on June 20, 2018 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Hudson, Esra)
June 28, 2018 190 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by City and County of San Francisco for proceedings held on June 20, 2018 before Judge John A Mendez. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Eisenberg, Sara)
June 28, 2018 189 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 6/20/18, before District Judge John A. Mendez, filed by Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran, Phone number 916-448-2712 E-mail kohalloran@comcast.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may also be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 7/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2018. (O'Halloran, K)
June 27, 2018 194 MOTION for relief from default re 180 Minute Order by Vadim Stanley Miesegaes. (Kaminski, H)
June 22, 2018 188 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re 186 by United States of America for proceedings held on 6/20/18 before Judge Hon. John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Shelledy, David)
June 22, 2018 187 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Xavier Becerra, State of California for proceedings held on June 20, 2018 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Sherman, Lee)
June 22, 2018 186 [DISREGARD-SEE 188 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 6/20/18 before Judge Delaney. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Shelledy, David) Modified on 6/25/2018 (Hunt, G).
June 20, 2018 185 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge John A. Mendez: MOTION HEARING held on 6/20/2018 re 77 Motion to Dismiss filed by State of California, Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr., 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America,After extensive hearing and arguments, the Court ordered the matter submitted. Court to issue order in due course. Plaintiffs Counsel C. Readler; E. Reuveni; D. Shelledy; L. Bingham; F. Genova present. Defendants Counsel L. Sherman; C. Chuang. A. Hakl; C. Melton present. Court Reporter: K. O'Halloran. (Vine, H)
June 15, 2018 184 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/15/2018 re: Requests for Judicial Notice. The court takes JUDICIAL NOTICE on Plaintiff's exhibits 2, 3, 6, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, and 17. The court takes JUDICIAL NOTICE on Defendants' exhibits A, B, C, D, E, F, G, H, I, J, and K. The court DECLINES to take judicial notice on Plaintiff's exhibits 1, 4, 5 and 7 and Defendants' exhibit L. (Donati, J)
June 13, 2018 183 REPLY by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California re 77 Motion to Dismiss. (Sherman, Lee)
June 12, 2018 182 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by California Partnership to End Domestic Violence and Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights. (Amdur, Spencer) Modified on 6/13/2018 (Donati, J).
June 12, 2018 181 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by County of Orange and Sandra Hutchens. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Golden, John) Modified on 6/12/2018 (Donati, J).
June 12, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 180 Minute Order served on Vadim Stanley Miesegaes. (Donati, J)
June 12, 2018 180 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed Pro Se Litigant Vadim S. Miesegaes Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff. ECF No. 179 . The deadline for amicus curiae briefs in support of Plaintiff was April 6, 2018. ECF No. 34. Miesagaes did not mail his motion until May 16, 2018, well after the Courts deadline. Accordingly, his motion is DENIED. Miesegaes Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, ECF No. 179-2, is DENIED as moot. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
June 11, 2018 178 SEALED EVENT (Donati, J)
June 11, 2018 177 NOTICE of ERRATA by United States of America re 171 Exhibit O in Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit O)(Bingham, Lauren) Modified on 6/11/2018 (Donati, J).
June 11, 2018 176 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/11/2018 GRANTING 174 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s). (Washington, S) (Main Document 176 replaced on 6/11/2018) (Donati, J).
June 11, 2018 175 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed Municipalities and Elected Officials Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief. ECF No. 168 . The Motion for Leave is DENIED. Apart from those the Court has expressly permitted, no further amicus or amici curiae briefs will be allowed concerning the pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H) Modified on 6/11/2018 (Donati, J).
June 8, 2018 174 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by United States of America. (Genova, Francesca)
June 8, 2018 173 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Article, "We Will Prosecute", # 3 Exhibit AB 450 FAQs, # 4 Exhibit Article, "California Becomes Sanctuary State", # 5 Exhibit Press Release, Assemblymember David Chiu, # 6 Exhibit Press Release, Cal. Dep't of Justice)(Genova, Francesca) Modified on 6/11/2018 (Donati, J).
June 8, 2018 172 WITHDRAWAL by United States of America of 169 Request for Judicial Notice. (Genova, Francesca) Modified on 6/11/2018 (Donati, J).
June 8, 2018 171 REPLY by United States of America to RESPONSE to 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y)(Reuveni, Erez)
June 8, 2018 170 WITHDRAWAL by United States of America of 167 Reply to Response to Motion. (Reuveni, Erez) Modified on 6/11/2018 (Donati, J).
June 8, 2018 169 [WITHDRAWN pursuant to 172 Notice] Request Judicial Notice by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Genova, Francesca) Modified on 6/11/2018 (Donati, J).
June 8, 2018 168 MOTION for LEAVE to file Amici Curiae Brief by City of Aliso Viejo, City of Escondido, City of Glendora, City of Laguna Niguel, City of Yorba Linda, Rebecca Jones, Mike Spence . Attorney Joseph, Lawrence John added. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Updated Corporate Disclosure, # 3 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(Joseph, Lawrence) Modified on 6/11/2018 (Donati, J).
June 8, 2018 167 [WITHDRAWN pursuant to 170 Notice] REPLY by United States of America to RESPONSE to 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y)(Reuveni, Erez) Modified on 6/8/2018 (Donati, J). Modified on 6/11/2018 (Donati, J).
June 6, 2018 166 OPPOSITION by United States of America to 77 Motion to Dismiss. (Reuveni, Erez)
June 6, 2018 165 AMENDED DECLARATIONS by State of California re 75 . (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Wong, # 2 Amended Declaration of Wong) (Chuang, Christine) Modified on 6/6/2018 (York, M).
June 5, 2018 164 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/4/2018 DENYING 73 Motion to Intervene by Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, California Partnership to End Domestic Violence. Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights and California Partnership to End Domestic Violence may file an amici curiae brief by 6/12/2018. (Donati, J)
June 4, 2018 179 MOTION to file Amicus Curiae Brief by Vadim Stanley Miesegaes. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 IFP Application)(Donati, J)
June 4, 2018 163 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/4/2018 DENYING 59 Motion to Intervene by County of Orange and Sandra Hutchens. County of Orange and Sandra Hutchens may file an amici curiae brief by 6/12/2018. (Donati, J)
May 30, 2018 162 MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on the motion(s) now calendared for June 5, 2018 is/are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
May 29, 2018 161 REPLY by California Partnership to End Domestic Violence, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights to RESPONSE to 73 Motion to Intervene. (Amdur, Spencer)
May 29, 2018 160 NOTICE of Errata by County of Orange, Sandra Hutchens re 59 Motion to Intervene. (Golden, John)
May 29, 2018 159 REPLY by County of Orange, Sandra Hutchens to RESPONSE to 59 Motion to Intervene. (Golden, John)
May 24, 2018 158 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/24/2018 ORDERING that California shall respond to interrogatories 2, 3, 7, and 8 as limited by the court at the conference. California's responses to the interrogatories shall be due 6/1/2018, unless the parties agree otherwise. (Washington, S)
May 24, 2018 157 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman: INFORMAL TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held on 5/24/2018. Counsel for parties present and appearing by telephone. The Court and counsel discussed discovery. Order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel Lauren Bingham and Erez Reuveni present. Defendants Counsel Anthony Hakl and Lee Sherman present. (Waldrop, A)
May 23, 2018 156 SUPPLEMENT by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California re 77 Motion to Dismiss, 74 Opposition to Motion. (Sherman, Lee)
May 23, 2018 155 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/23/2018: After communication with parties, an informal telephonic discovery conference in this matter is set for 05/24/2018 at 08:30 a.m. Pacific Time before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The parties are instructed to call 5 minutes prior to the telephonic conference using the conference call instructions sent to them in a separate email. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
May 23, 2018 154 RESPONSE by United States of America to 59 Motion to Intervene. (Genova, Francesca)
May 23, 2018 153 CLERKS NOTICE: All Attorneys must comply with Local Rule 131(c). The Combination of a Login, Password and signature consisting of a /s/ First Name-Last Name must all be from the same attorney to constitute a signature of the user for the purposes of CM/ECF. In addition, attorneys name must appear in the attorney caption information at the top left side of the first page of every document filed. Documents filed by attorneys not appearing as counsel and/or not in compliance with Local Rule 131(c) may have their document stricken by the court. This Notice is for future filings. No Attorney is required to re-file their document at this time. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Donati, J)
May 22, 2018 152 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of 150 Opposition to Motion by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 [DISREGARD - TO BE REFILED AS SEPARATE DOCKET ENTRY] Corrected Brief) (Gray, Kathryne) Modified on 5/23/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 22, 2018 151 OPPOSITION by United States of America to 73 Motion to Intervene. (Gray, Kathryne)
May 22, 2018 150 [WITHDRAWN PER 152 NOTICE] OPPOSITION by United States of America to 59 Motion to Intervene. (Gray, Kathryne) Modified on 5/23/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 22, 2018 149 OPPOSITION by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California to 73 Motion to Intervene. Attorney Onyeagbako, Maureen C. added. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Onyeagbako, Maureen)
May 22, 2018 148 OPPOSITION by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California to 59 Motion to Intervene. (Hakl, Anthony)
May 22, 2018 147 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 5/18/18 before Judge Kendall J. Newman. Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Shelledy, David)
May 22, 2018 146 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Discover Hearing held on 5/18/18, before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman, filed by Jennifer Coulthard, Phone number 312-617-9858 E-mail jenrmrcrr2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 6/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (Dunn-Coulthard, J)
May 22, 2018 145 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties stipulation and proposed order. ECF No. 142. It is hereby ordered that: The State may file a five-page supplemental brief discussing the significance of Murphy v. National Collegiate Athletic Assn on or before Wednesday, May 23, 2018. The United States is permitted an additional five pages for its Reply in support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction to respond to the States supplemental brief, only. The Court declines to grant extensions on the remaining filing deadlines. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
May 21, 2018 144 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Angelica H. Salceda on behalf of California Partnership to End Domestic Violence, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights. Attorney Salceda, Angelica H. added. (Salceda, Angelica)
May 21, 2018 143 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julia Harumi Mass on behalf of California Partnership to End Domestic Violence, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights. Attorney Mass, Julia Harumi added. (Mass, Julia)
May 21, 2018 142 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Briefing Schedule and Supplemental Briefing by Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr. (Chuang, Christine)
May 21, 2018 141 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kathryne M. Gray on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Gray, Kathryne M. added. (Gray, Kathryne)
May 21, 2018 140 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Center for Human Rights and Constitutional Law (and associated parties). (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 139 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by The District of Columbia (and associated parties). (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 138 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Annie Lai (and associated parties). (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 137 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by PICO California (and associated parties). (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 136 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by National Immigration Law Center (and associated parties). (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 135 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Anti-Defamation League. (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 134 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by California Labor Federation (and associated parties). (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 133 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by California State Senate. (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 132 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Seth Davis, Christopher Lasch (and associated parties). (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 131 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by City of New York (and associated parties). (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 130 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Tahirih Justice Center (and associated parties). (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 129 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by County of Los Angeles (and associated parties). (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 128 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by City of Los Angeles. (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 127 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Law Enforcement Action Partnership (and associated parties). (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 126 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Freedom For Immigrants, Human Rights Watch, Immigrant Legal Resource Center. (Donati, J)
May 21, 2018 125 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed the timely filed motions for leave to file amicus and amici curiae briefs. ECF Nos. 96, 98, 99, 105, 109, 110, 111, 113, 114, 115, 116, 120, 122, 123, & 124. Each motion is GRANTED. The proposed briefs attached to the motions are deemed filed. ECF No. 96-1, 98-1, 99-1, 105-1, 109-1, 110-1, 111-1, 113-2, 114-1, 115-1, 116-1, 120-1, 120-2, 122-2, 122-3, 123-1, and 124-1. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
May 18, 2018 124 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Center for Human Rights and Constitutional Law (and associated parties). Attorney Schey, Peter Anthony added. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Schey, Peter) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 123 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF of The District of Columbia (and associated parties). Attorney Morosco, Taylor Cross added. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae)(Morosco, Taylor) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 122 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Annie Lai, Kathleen Kim, Emily Robinson (and associated parties). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Motion for Leave, # 2 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 3 Appendix A - Proposed Amici Curiae, # 4 Proposed Order)(Phillips, Bradley) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 121 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bradley S. Phillips on behalf of Annie Lai, Kathleen Kim, Emily Robinson (and associated parties). Attorney Phillips, Bradley S. added. (Phillips, Bradley) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 120 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by PICO California, National Council of Jewish Women-California, Franciscan Action Network, Rabbi Jonathan D. Klein. Attorney Hudson, Esra Acikalin added. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Addendum to Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hudson, Esra) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 119 NOTICE of SUBSEQUENT AUTHORITY re 73 Motion to Intervene by California Partnership to End Domestic Violence, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Amdur, Spencer) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 118 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/18/2018 DIRECTING parties on discovery issues. Any request for expedited discovery beyond the parameters of this order is DENIED. (See Order for details and instructions). (York, M)
May 18, 2018 117 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California for proceedings held on May 18, 2018 before Judge Kendall J. Newman. Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Hakl, Anthony)
May 18, 2018 116 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by National Immigration Law Center (and associated parties). Attorney Weissglass, Jonathan D added. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Weissglass, Jonathan) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 115 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Anti-Defamation League. Attorney Perrin, Robert W. added. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief , # 2 Proposed Order)(Perrin, Robert) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 114 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by California Labor Federation (and associated parties). Attorney Guizar, Monica T. added. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Amici Curiae, # 2 Proposed Order)(Guizar, Monica) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 113 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by California State Senate. Attorney Almadani, Monica Ramirez added. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Amicus Brief)(Almadani, Monica) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 112 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by City and County of San Francisco. Attorney Lee, Mollie Mindes added. (Lee, Mollie) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 111 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Seth Davis, Christopher Lasch (and associated parties), (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, # 2 Proposed Order)(Calia, Kevin) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 110 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by City of New York (and associated parties). Attorney Holtzman, Jonathan Victor added. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: # 1 Opposition, # 2 Proposed Order)(Holtzman, Jonathan) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 109 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Tahirih Justice Center (and associated parties). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gorelick, Jamie) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 108 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, Criminal Law, and Immigration Law Scholars for attorney Michael D. Schwartz to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7667789) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Calia, Kevin)
May 18, 2018 107 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, Criminal Law, and Immigration Law Scholars for attorney Jamison Davies to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7667777) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Calia, Kevin)
May 18, 2018 106 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, Criminal Law, and Immigration Law Scholars for attorney Harry Sandick to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Calia, Kevin A. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7667734) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Calia, Kevin)
May 18, 2018 105 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by County of Los Angeles (and associated parties). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, # 2 Proposed Order)(Carter, Margaret) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 104 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by National Health Law Program (and associated parties). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Studies cited in brief)(Coursolle, Abigail) Modified on 5/18/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 103 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel Joseph Tully on behalf of County of Los Angeles. Attorney Tully, Daniel Joseph added. (Tully, Daniel)
May 18, 2018 102 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel R. Suvor on behalf of County of Los Angeles. Attorney Suvor, Daniel R. added. (Suvor, Daniel)
May 18, 2018 101 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Margaret L. Carter on behalf of County of Los Angeles. Attorney Carter, Margaret L. added. (Carter, Margaret)
May 18, 2018 100 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman: DISCOVERY HEARING held on 5/18/2018. Counsel for parties present. The Court and counsel discussed discovery issues in the case. Order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel David Shelledy, Lauren Bingham, and Erez Reuvani present. Defendants Counsel Anthony Hakl and Lee Sherman present. Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (Waldrop, A)
May 18, 2018 99 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by City of Los Angeles. Attorney Trivedi, Harit Upendra added. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Trivedi, Harit) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 98 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Law Enforcement Action Partnership (LEAP) (and associated parties). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Geltzer, Joshua) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 18, 2018 97 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Abigail Coursolle on behalf of National Health Law Program (and associated parties). Attorney Coursolle, Abigail added. (Coursolle, Abigail) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 17, 2018 96 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Immigrant Legal Resource Center, Human Rights Watch, Freedom For Immigrants. Attorney Lee, Elaine Y. added. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lee, Elaine) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 17, 2018 95 JOINT LETTER BRIEF re (#85) Order by United States of America. (Genova, Francesca) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 17, 2018 94 Featured Case PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/16/18. Added Attorney Joshua A. Geltzer, PHV for Proposed Amici Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders. (Becknal, R)
May 17, 2018 93 Featured Case PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/16/18. Added Attorney Jamie S. Gorelick, PHV for Tahirih Justice Center. (Becknal, R)
May 16, 2018 92 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Tahirih Justice Center for attorney Jamie S. Gorelick to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Babbitt, Christopher Edmunds added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7662576) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Babbitt, Christopher) Modified on 5/16/2018 (Nelson, J).
May 16, 2018 91 Featured Case PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/16/18. Added Attorney Omar C. Jadwat, PHV for California Partnership to End Domestic Violence and Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 16, 2018 90 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Francesca Genova on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Genova, Francesca added. (Genova, Francesca)
May 16, 2018 89 Featured Case PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/16/18. Added Attorney Lee Gelernt for California Partnership to End Domestic Violence and Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 15, 2018 88 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Proposed Amici Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders for attorney Joshua A. Geltzer to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7661815) (Pitts, Patrick)
May 15, 2018 87 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by California Partnership to End Domestic Violence, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights for attorney Lee Gelernt to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7661749) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing - Gelernt)(Amdur, Spencer)
May 15, 2018 86 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by California Partnership to End Domestic Violence, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights for attorney Omar C. Jadwat to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7661725) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing - Jadwat)(Amdur, Spencer)
May 15, 2018 85 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/15/2018: A discovery conference in this matter is set for 05/18/2018 at 09:30 a.m. Pacific Time in Courtroom No. 25 before Judge Newman. The parties may appear in person or by telephone. If a telephonic appearance is desired, the parties shall promptly contact the undersigned's courtroom deputy clerk at (916) 930-4187 to make appropriate arrangements. Additionally, no later than 05/17/2018 at 11:00 a.m., the parties shall file a joint letter brief, limited to no more than 8 pages, addressing the parties' remaining disputes concerning proposed expedited discovery. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
May 15, 2018 84 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman: INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE held on 5/15/2018. Counsel for parties present and appearing by phone. Court and counsel discussed case. Minute Order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel Lauren Bingham and Erez Reuveni present. Defendants Counsel Lee Sherman and Cherokee Melton present. (Waldrop, A)
May 14, 2018 83 NOTICE of FILING CORRECTED 74 DECLARATION by Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Cherokee Melton, # 2 Amended Declaration of Cherokee Melton )(Melton, Cherokee) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 8, 2018 82 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Cody H. Wofsy on behalf of California Partnership to End Domestic Violence, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights. Attorney Wofsy, Cody H. added. (Wofsy, Cody)
May 7, 2018 81 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3) (Donati, J)
May 7, 2018 80 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/7/2018 GRANTING 76 Request to Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Fabillaran, J)
May 7, 2018 79 MINUTE ORDER: After reviewing Defendants Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 77, and Opposition to the Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 74, the Court has determined that it will conserve judicial resources and set the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss for the same date and time as the hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See ECF No. 41. Plaintiffs opposition is due June 6, 2018, and Defendants reply is due June 13, 2018. The parties are reminded of the Courts instruction cautioning against objections to evidence. ECF No. 41. This instruction does not extend to Defendants requests for judicial notice, see ECF No. 78, which Plaintiff may address where pertinent. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
May 4, 2018 78 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California in Support of 77 Motion to Dismiss and 74 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherman, Lee) Modified on 5/7/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
May 4, 2018 77 MOTION to DISMISS by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sherman, Lee) Modified on 5/7/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
May 4, 2018 76 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by All Defendants. (Sherman, Lee)
May 4, 2018 75 DECLARATION of Joe Dominic in opposition to 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chris Caligiuri, # 2 Declaration of Arif Alikhan, # 3 Declaration of Jim Hart, # 4 Declaration of Jeffrey Rosen, # 5 Declaration of Diana Carbajal, # 6 Declaration of Holly Cooper, # 7 Declaration of Tom Wong)(Sherman, Lee)
May 4, 2018 74 OPPOSITION by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California to 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Declaration of Cherokee Melton)(Sherman, Lee) Modified on 5/7/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
May 4, 2018 73 MOTION to INTERVENE by Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, California Partnership to End Domestic Violence. Attorney Amdur, Spencer E. W. added. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injuction, # 3 Proposed Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Declaration of Kathy Moore, # 5 Declaration of Angelica Salas, # 6 Proposed Order)(Amdur, Spencer) Modified on 5/7/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
May 1, 2018 72 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by County of Orange, Sandra Hutchens re 60 Certificate of Service, 59 Motion to Intervene, 58 Notice of Appearance. (Golden, John)
April 30, 2018 71 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/30/18: No hearing date and no dates for the filing of the opposition and reply briefs for Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss will be set at this time. The Motion to Dismiss will not, under any circumstances, be heard before June 20, 2018. The requests to enlarge the Court's page limits for the Motion to Dismiss are denied. (Kaminski, H)
April 30, 2018 70 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by County of Orange, Sandra Hutchens re 60 Certificate of Service, 59 Motion to Intervene, 58 Notice of Appearance. (Golden, John)
April 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 69 Minute Order served on Dana T. Blackmore. (Donati, J)
April 30, 2018 69 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Dana T. Blackmores Amended Motion for Permission to Electronically File. ECF No. 68. The Court denied Blackmores Motion to Intervene. See ECF No. 66. Blackmores Amended Motion for Permission to Electronically File is DENIED as moot. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
April 27, 2018 68 AMENDED MOTION for PERMISSION to ELECTRONICALLY FILE by Dana T. Blackmore. (York, M)
April 27, 2018 67 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California and United States of America (Hakl, Anthony) Modified on 4/27/2018 (Donati, J).
April 27, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 66 Order served on Dana T. Blackmore. (Donati, J)
April 27, 2018 66 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/27/2018 DENYING 63 Motion to Intervene. Dana T. Blackmore terminated. (Donati, J)
April 24, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 65 Minute Order served on Dana T. Blackmore. (Donati, J)
April 24, 2018 65 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Proposed Intervenor Dana T. Blackmores (Blackmore) Motion for Permission to Electronically File. ECF No. 64. Blackmore is appearing pro se. Local Rule 133 provides that [a]ny person appearing pro se may not utilize electronic filing except with the permission of the assigned Judge or Magistrate JudgeAll pro se parties shall file and serve paper documents as required by applicable Federal Rules of Civil or Criminal Procedure or by these Rules. E.D. Cal. L.R. 133(b)(2). Blackmores motion does not set forth a compelling reason why the Court should deviate from the Local Rules and its standard practice of disallowing the use of electronic filing by pro se litigants. See E.D. Cal. L.R. 133(b)(3). Blackmores motion is DENIED. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
April 24, 2018 64 MOTION for Permission to Electronically File by Dana T. Blackmore. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Donati, J)
April 24, 2018 63 MOTION to INTERVENE by Dana T. Blackmore. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Complaint in Intervention, # 2 Proposed Order)(Donati, J)
April 24, 2018 62 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/24/18 ORDERING that The State of California's time to respond to the complaint is EXTENDED an additional nine (9) days, up to and including 5/4/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 23, 2018 61 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Re: Extension of Time for the State of California to Respond to the United States' Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. (Hakl, Anthony)
April 20, 2018 60 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by County of Orange, Sandra Hutchens, Sheriff-Coroner for the County of Orange re 59 Motion to Intervene, 58 Notice of Appearance. (Golden, John) Modified on 4/23/2018 (Reader, L).
April 20, 2018 59 MOTION to INTERVENE by County of Orange, Sandra Hutchens, Sheriff-Coroner for the County of Orange. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jack W. Golden, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Declaration Robert J. Peterson, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2 , # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Proposed Order)(Golden, John) Modified on 4/23/2018 (Reader, L).
April 20, 2018 58 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by John Wisner Golden on behalf of County of Orange, Sandra Hutchens, Sheriff-Coroner for the County of Orange. Attorney Golden, John Wisner added. (Golden, John)
April 12, 2018 57 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Municipalities and Elected Officials in Support of 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Donati, J)
April 12, 2018 56 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Federal Law Enforcement Officers Association and National Border Patrol Council in Support of 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Donati, J)
April 12, 2018 55 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Advocates for Victims of Illegal Alien Crime, Fight Sanctuary State, National Sheriffs' Association in Support of 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Donati, J)
April 12, 2018 54 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed three motions for leave to file amicus curiae briefs in support of Plaintiff, one by the National Sheriffs Association, Advocates for Victims of Illegal Alien Crime, and Fight Sanctuary State, ECF No. 47, one by the Federal Law Enforcement Officers and National Border Patrol Council, ECF No. 49, and one by municipalities and elected officials, ECF No. 50. The Court GRANTS each motion and the proposed briefs, ECF Nos. 47-1, 49, and 50-3 are deemed filed. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY)(Vine, H)
April 12, 2018 53 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/11/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
April 11, 2018 52 MINUTE ORDER: Amici curiae are advised that the Court will only consider briefing that helps the Court beyond the help the lawyers for the parties are able to provide; duplicative or cumulative arguments will not be considered. Amici should substantially comply with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 29(a), except that parties should look to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules for guidance as to form. Briefs shall not exceed 15 pages. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
April 9, 2018 51 STIPULATION and PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by United States of America. (Bingham, Lauren) Modified on 4/10/2018 (Donati, J).
April 6, 2018 50 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by City of Aliso Viejo, City of Barstow, City of Escondido, City of Fountain Valley, City of Hesperia, City of Mission Viejo, City of Yorba Linda, Mike Spence, David Harrington, Jim Desmond, Rebecca Jones, Ryan Vienna, Dana T Rohrabacher. Attorney Joseph, Lawrence John added. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 4 Addendum to Amici Brief)(Joseph, Lawrence) Modified on 4/9/2018 (Donati, J).
April 6, 2018 49 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Federal Law Enforcement Officers Association and National Border Patrol Council. Attorney Benbrook, Bradley A. added. (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 4/6/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 6, 2018 48 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation and Michael Rushford in SUPPORT of 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Attorney Scheidegger, Kent Stephen added. (Scheidegger, Kent) Modified on 4/6/2018 (Donati, J).
April 6, 2018 47 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF in Support of Plaintiff by National Sheriffs' Association, Advocates for Victims of Illegal Alien Crime, Fight Sanctuary State. Attorney Axelrod, Julie Beth added. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief)(Axelrod, Julie) Modified on 4/6/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 2, 2018 46 AMENDED DECLARATIONS by United States of America in Support of 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Thomas Homan, # 2 Amended Declaration of Thomas Homan, # 3 Supplemental Declaration of Todd Hoffman, # 4 Amended Declaration of Todd Hoffman)(Bingham, Lauren) Modified on 4/2/2018 (Donati, J).
April 2, 2018 45 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Cherokee Dawn-Marie Melton on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. Attorney Melton, Cherokee Dawn-Marie added. (Melton, Cherokee)
March 30, 2018 44 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Phil Bryant, Paul Lepage, State Of Nevada, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia in Support of 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Donati, J)
March 30, 2018 43 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by American Center for Law and Justice in Support of 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Donati, J)
March 30, 2018 42 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed two motions for leave to file amicus curiae briefs in support of Plaintiff, one by the American Center for Law and Justice, ECF No. 32, and one by the States of Texas, Alabama, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Michigan, Missouri, Nebraska, Nevada, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, West Virginia, and the Governors of Mississippi and Maine, ECF No. 36. The Court GRANTS each motion and the proposed briefs, ECF Nos. 32-1, 36-1, are deemed filed. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
March 29, 2018 41 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/29/2018 ORDERING: Defendants' Opposition Brief due by 5/4/2018; Amici Curiae Briefs due by 5/18/2018; Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 6/8/2018; and the hearing on 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction hearing set for 6/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Donati, J)
March 29, 2018 40 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/21/18, before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman, filed by Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett, Phone number 916-442-8420 E-mail reporter.bennett@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 4/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (Bennett, K)
March 29, 2018 39 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/29/2018 DENYING 18 Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. (Donati, J)
March 27, 2018 38 STIPULATION for EXTENSION of TIME to Respond to 1 Complaint until 4/25/2018. (Sherman, Lee) Modified on 3/28/2018 (Donati, J).
March 27, 2018 37 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for District Judge John A. Mendez on 03/27/2018: Amici curiae are advised that the Court will only consider briefing that helps the Court beyond the help the lawyers for the parties are able to provide; duplicative or cumulative arguments will not be considered. Amici should substantially comply with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 29(a), except that parties should look to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules for guidance as to form. Briefs shall not exceed 15 pages. (Streeter, J)
March 26, 2018 36 MOTION for LEAVE by Phil Bryant, Paul Lepage, State Of Nevada, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia to file Amicus Curiae in support of 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hacker, David) Modified on 3/26/2018 (Donati, J).
March 26, 2018 35 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Jonathan Hacker on behalf of State of Texas, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State Of Nevada, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of West Virginia, Phil Bryant, Paul Lepage. (Hacker, David)
March 26, 2018 34 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for District Judge John A. Mendez on 03/26/2018: The United States' Motion for 11-Day Extension of Time for Amicus Filings on Plaintiff's Behalf, ECF No. 31 , is GRANTED. Amicus briefs in support of Plaintiff's motion are now due April 6, 2018. (Streeter, J)
March 26, 2018 33 [DISREGARD- DUPLICATE of 32 Motion ] MOTION for LEAVE by the American Center for Law and Justice to filed Amicus Curiae in support of 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kozina, Vladimir) Modified on 3/26/2018 (Donati, J).
March 26, 2018 32 MOTION for LEAVE by the American Center for Law and Justice to file Amicus Curiae in support of 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Attorney Kozina, Vladimir F. added. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kozina, Vladimir) Modified on 3/26/2018 (Donati, J).
March 23, 2018 31 MOTION for 11-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME by United States of America to Allow Amicus Filings On Plaintiff's Behalf re 17 Minute Order. (Press, Joshua) Modified on 3/26/2018 (Donati, J).
March 23, 2018 30 REPLY by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California re 18 Motion to Transfer Venue. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice & Exhibits A-D) (Sherman, Lee)
March 23, 2018 29 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on March 21, 2018 before Judge Kendall J. Newman. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Shelledy, David)
March 22, 2018 28 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/22/2018 GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART California's Request for Expedited Discovery. California may depose Thomas D. Moman and Todd Hoffman on the terms outlined in the order. No later than 3/23/2018 at 12:00 pm. Pacific Time, California shall provide the United States a list of paragraphs in the deponents' declarations containing alleged specific facts of irreparable injury for which existing supportive documents should be produced at the depositions. Any request for expedited discovery beyond the parameters of this order is DENIED. (Donati, J)
March 22, 2018 27 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California for proceedings held on March 21, 2018 before Judge Kendall J. Newman. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Sherman, Lee)
March 21, 2018 26 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman: DISCOVERY HEARING held on 3/21/2018. Counsel for parties present. The Court and counsel discussed discovery related issues in the case. Order to issue. Plaintiff's Counsel David Shelledy, Lauren Bingham, and August Flentje present. Defendants' Counsel Anthony Hakl and Lee Sherman present. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Waldrop, A)
March 20, 2018 25 OPPOSITION by United States of America to 18 Motion to Transfer Venue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Press, Joshua)
March 20, 2018 24 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by August Edward Flentje on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Flentje, August Edward added. (Flentje, August)
March 19, 2018 23 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/19/2018: Upon review of the joint letter brief (ECF No. 22 ), the Court CONFIRMS the 3/21/2018 discovery hearing at 03:00 PM (Pacific Time) in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Counsel appearing by telephone for the hearing are instructed to call 5 minutes prior to the hearing into the conference line 1-888-363-4734 and use the access code 1245690 plus # and security code 4223 plus # when prompted. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
March 19, 2018 22 JOINT LETTER BRIEF by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. Attorney Hakl, Anthony R. added. (Hakl, Anthony) Modified on 3/20/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 15, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/15/2018 CLARIFYING 20 Order: 1) Prior to the 3/19/2018 filing of the joint letter brief, parties are EXPECTED to meet and confer, which should include voice-to-voice dialogue; 2) To initiate such meet-and-confer efforts, the State of California shall promptly identify and provide to the United States what discovery is sought; 3) The parties shall the COOPERATIVELY prepare the joint letter brief; and 4) The joint letter brief shall not exceed 10 pages, in Times New Roman pt. 12 or equivalent font. (Donati, J)
March 14, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/14/2018 ORDERING that, no later than 3/19/2018 at 4:00 PM Pacific Time, the parties shall file a joint letter brief re expedited discovery. The parties' joint letter brief shall not exceed 10 pages. Upon review of the parties joint letter brief, the court may elect to entertain oral argument or may submit the matter for decision without oral argument on the record and written briefing. If the court elects to entertain oral argument, it will be conducted on 3/21/2018, at 3:00 PM Pacific Time, in Courtroom No. 25 before the undersigned. The parties shall set aside that time in the interim for a potential court appearance. Telephonic appearances will be permitted. (Zignago, K.)
March 13, 2018 19 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. re 18 Motion to transfer venue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through I)(Chuang, Christine) Modified on 3/15/2018 (Reader, L).
March 13, 2018 18 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chuang, Christine) Modified on 3/15/2018 (Reader, L).
March 12, 2018 17 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are ordered not to file any further statements, responses, or arguments, see ECF Nos. 10, 14, 16, not specifically authorized or requested by the Court, see ECF No. 7 (requesting a stipulation by the parties). Only formal motions that comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Courts Local Rules, and this Courts Order re filing Requirements, ECF No. 5-2, will be considered by the Court. The Court authorizes Defendants to file their motion to transfer and the Court will decide this motion on shortened time. Defendants opening brief in support of the motion to transfer is due by March 13, 2018. Plaintiffs opposition is due March 20, 2018, and Defendants reply is due March 23, 2018. No hearing on this motion will be set as the Court will decide the motion on the papers. See E.D. Local Rule 230(g). Any motion for expedited discovery shall be filed with the assigned Magistrate Judge in this case, Kendall J. Newman. The parties are instructed to discuss a briefing schedule and contact Magistrate Judge Newmans chambers by the close of business tomorrow. The final briefing schedule for Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is, of course, dependent on the Courts rulings with respect to the motion to transfer and/or motion for expedited discovery. For now, amicus briefs in support of Plaintiffs motion are due March 26, 2018. Defendants opposition, amicus briefs in support of Defendant, Plaintiffs reply, and the hearing date on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction will, if necessary, be set following resolution of the motion to transfer. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
March 12, 2018 16 RESPONSE by United States of America to 14 Scheduling Report. (Reuveni, Erez)
March 11, 2018 15 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christine Chuang on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. Attorney Chuang, Christine added. (Chuang, Christine)
March 9, 2018 14 PROPOSED BREFING SCHEDULE by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr., State of California. (Sherman, Lee) Modified on 3/12/2018 (Reader, L).
March 9, 2018 13 [DISREGARD- DUPLICATE of 11 Notice of Appearance] NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lee I. Sherman on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. (Sherman, Lee) Modified on 3/9/2018 (Donati, J).
March 9, 2018 12 Featured Case NON-RELATED ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 9, 2018 ORDERING that the court determined that it is INAPPROPRIATE to relate or reassign the cases, and therefore DECLINES to do so. (Munoz, I) Modified on 3/9/2018 (Donati, J).
March 9, 2018 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lee I. Sherman on behalf of State of California, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr. and Xavier Becerra. Attorney Sherman, Lee I. added. (Sherman, Lee) Modified on 3/9/2018 (Donati, J).
March 9, 2018 10 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Plaintiff United States of America re: 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez) Modified on 3/9/2018 (Donati, J).
March 8, 2018 9 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 18-322 by United States of America. (Reuveni, Erez)
March 8, 2018 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: State of California, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr. and Xavier Becerra served on 3/7/2018. (Reuveni, Erez) Modified on 3/8/2018 (Donati, J).
March 7, 2018 7 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs Request for Leave to File its Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Excess of the Page Limit, ECF No. 6, is GRANTED. The page restrictions outlined in the Courts Order re Filing Requirements, ECF No. 5-2, are suspended in relation to the pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction only. Defendants Opposition shall not exceed forty pages. Plaintiffs Reply shall not exceed twenty-five pages. The parties should file a stipulation as to the briefing schedule by Friday, March 9, 2018. Should the parties be unable to reach an agreement, the Court will set the schedule and hearing date. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
March 7, 2018 6 MOTION for enlargement of page limit for memorandum in support of 2 motion for preliminary injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez) Modified on 3/7/2018 (Zignago, K.).
March 6, 2018 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Order re Filing Requirements, # 3 VDRP) (Donati, J)
March 6, 2018 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr., State of California* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Erez Reuveni* *US Department of Justice, Office of Immigration Litigation* *P.O. Box 868* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Donati, J)
March 6, 2018 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (Reuveni, Erez)
March 6, 2018 2 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez)
March 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. Attorney Reuveni, Erez added. (Reuveni, Erez)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lauren C. Bingham(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: August Edward Flentje
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Erez Reuveni, GOVT
Represented By: David Taylor Shelledy(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Christine Chuang
Represented By: Anthony R. Hakl, III
Represented By: Cherokee Dawn-Marie Melton
Represented By: Lee I. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Christine Chuang
Represented By: Anthony R. Hakl, III
Represented By: Cherokee Dawn-Marie Melton
Represented By: Lee I. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Christine Chuang
Represented By: Anthony R. Hakl, III
Represented By: Cherokee Dawn-Marie Melton
Represented By: Lee I. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Center for Law and Justice
Represented By: Vladimir F. Kozina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Texas
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Alabama
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Arkansas
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Florida
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Georgia
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Indiana
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Kansas
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Louisiana
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Michigan
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Missouri
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Nebraska
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State Of Nevada
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Ohio
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of South Carolina
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of West Virginia
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Phil Bryant
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Paul Lepage
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?