Tsunami Sales & Marketing, Inc. v. Johnson Outdoors, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tsunami Sales & Marketing, Inc.
Defendant: Johnson Outdoors, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00520
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 03/11/19 DISMISSING all claims and counterclaims of any sort asserted with prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs and fees. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/9/19 ORDERING that VDRP to be completed by February 14, 2019; All discovery noticed to be completed by April 30, 2019; All motions noticed by April 30, 2019; All other terms of the Court's Case Management Order 17 and initial order for VDRP 20 shall remain in full force and effect. (Kaminski, H)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/05/18 REFERRING Matter to VDRP; Court's 17 Case Management Plan is hereby MODIFIED as follows: VDRP shall be completed by 01/02/19; all discovery shall be noticed as to be completed by 03/ 29/19; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Trial set for 9/10/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. All other terms of the Court's prior 17 Case Management Plan shall remain in full force and effect (cc: VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/25/18: Discovery due by 12/28/2018. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/1/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial set for 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED DISCOVERY CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/31/18. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsunami Sales & Marketing, Inc. v. Johnson Outdoors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tsunami Sales & Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: D. Clay Taylor, PHV
Represented By: Natalie P. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Outdoors, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline N. Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?