Cornejo v. Pfeiffer, et al.
Petitioner: |
Jesse Cornejo |
Respondent: |
Christian Pfeiffer and The Attorney General of the State of California |
Case Number: |
2:2018cv00572 |
Filed: |
March 15, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Presiding Judge: |
Morrison C. England |
Nature of Suit: |
General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 9, 2019 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM DECISION signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 5/9/2019 DENYING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Court DECLINES to issue a Certificate of Appealability. The Clerk of the Court is to enter judgment accordingly. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
|
January 18, 2019 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 01/16/19 ADOPTING 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full GRANTING 12 Motion to Strike unexhausted claims one and four; Claims one and four are DISMISSED as unexhausted. Respondent shall file a response to petitioner's habeas petition addressing the remaining, properly exhausted claims (claims two, three, and five) within 60 days. Any reply from Petitioner is due 30 days after service of the answer. (Benson, A.)
|
November 27, 2018 |
Filing
19
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/26/2018 RECOMMENDING 12 Motion to Strike Unexhausted Claims one and four be granted; claims one and four be dismissed as unexhausted; Respondent be directed to file a response to Petitioner's habeas petition addressing the properly exhausted claims (claims two, three, and five) within 60 days from the date of any order adopting these findings and recommendations; and Petitioner be directed to file a reply, if any, within 30 days after service of the answer. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
|
August 22, 2018 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/22/2018 GRANTING 15 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his opposition to 12 Motion to Dismiss. (Henshaw, R)
|
June 1, 2018 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/31/2018 GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent to have up to and including 7/24/2018 to file a responsive pleading. (Henshaw, R)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?