USA v. State of California et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: State of California, Edmund G. Brown, Jr. and California State Lands Commission
Case Number: 2:2018cv00721
Filed: April 2, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2018 24 CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by California State Lands Commission, State of California. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 3 Declaration of Jennifer Lucchesi, # 4 Declaration of John W. Killeen, # 5 Request for Judicial Notice, # 6 Index of Exhibits, # 7 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 8 Objections to Evidence , # 9 Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Declaration of Nicholas Hufford)(Killeen, John) Modified on 9/18/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
September 5, 2018 23 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/4/2018 ORDERING Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition/Cross-Motion due by 9/17/2018; United States' Memorandum in Opposition/Reply Memorandum by 10/12/2018; Defendants' Reply Memorandum due by 10/16/2018; and the motion hearing set for 10/29/2018 (unchanged). (Reader, L)
September 4, 2018 22 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Briefing Schedule for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by Edmund G. Brown, Jr, California State Lands Commission, State of California. (Killeen, John)
August 20, 2018 21 NOTICE of Erratum by United States of America re 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Grant, Eric)
August 16, 2018 20 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by United States of America. Motion Hearing SET for 10/29/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Declaration of Peter McVeigh and Exhibits 1 to 37), # 3 (Exhibits 38 to 57), # 4 (Exhibits 58 to 90), # 5 Declaration of David Blatstein (TEOAF), # 6 Declaration of Janet Eubanks (BLM Realty), # 7 Declaration of David Haase (GSA), # 8 Declaration of Sandra Lew (USDA FS), # 9 Declaration of Joseph D. Lowe (USPS), # 10 Declaration of Wesley Newbold (USMS), # 11 Declaration of Lisa M. Ng (ACE), # 12 Declaration of James V. Scrivner (BLM Minerals), # 13 Declaration of David Siegenthaler (DOI-NPS FLPP), # 14 Declaration of Scott W. Springer (BOR), # 15 Declaration of Nicholas Hufford (Expert))(Grant, Eric) Modified on 8/17/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 14, 2018 19 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Justin Heminger, GOV on behalf of United States of America. (Heminger, Justin)
August 9, 2018 18 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/8/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 2, 2018 17 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 08/02/18 ORDERING following revised briefing schedule and hearing date: U.S.' Motion for Summary Judgment: 08/16/18; Defendants' Opposition/Cross-Motion: 09/13/18; U.S. Opposition/Reply: 10/09/18; Defendants' Reply: 10/16/18; Hearing: 10/29/18. (Benson, A.)
August 1, 2018 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying 14 Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (McVeigh, Peter) Modified on 8/2/2018 (Benson, A.).
July 27, 2018 15 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by Edmund G. Brown, Jr, California State Lands Commission, State of California. (Killeen, John)
July 13, 2018 14 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 07/12/18 ORDERING that the 08/13/18 Status Conference is VACATED and setting the following briefing schedule and hearing date for cross-motions for summary judgment: U.S.' Motion for Summary Judgment: 08/13/18; Defendants' Opposition/Cross-Motion: 09/04/18; U.S. Opposition/Reply: 09/24/18; Defendants' Reply: 10/01/18; Hearing: 10/15/18. (Benson, A.)
July 12, 2018 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Briefing Schedule by United States of America. (McVeigh-GOVT, Peter)
July 12, 2018 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (McVeigh-GOVT, Peter)
June 13, 2018 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stacy Robbin Stoller on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Stoller, Stacy Robbin added. (Stoller, Stacy)
May 18, 2018 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peter James McVeigh-GOVT on behalf of United States of America. Attorney McVeigh-GOVT, Peter James added. (McVeigh-GOVT, Peter)
May 10, 2018 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Andrew Marc Vogel on behalf of Edmund G. Brown, Jr, California State Lands Commission, State of California. Attorney Vogel, Andrew Marc added. (Vogel, Andrew)
May 8, 2018 8 ANSWER by Edmund G. Brown, Jr, California State Lands Commission, State of California.(Killeen, John)
May 7, 2018 7 STIPULATION Dismissing Defendant Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Without Prejudice by Edmund G. Brown, Jr, California State Lands Commission, State of California. (Killeen, John)
April 20, 2018 6 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint by Edmund G. Brown, Jr, California State Lands Commission, State of California. Attorney Killeen, John William added. (Killeen, John)
April 6, 2018 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: State of California, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., California State Lands Commission served 4/3/2018. (Grant, Eric) Modified on 4/9/2018 (Zignago, K.).
April 2, 2018 4 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Edmund G. Brown, Jr, California State Lands Commission, State of California* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Eric Grant* *Environment and Natural Resources Division, U.S. Dept of Justice* *950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Room 2611* *Washington, DC 20530*. (Kastilahn, A)
April 2, 2018 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 8/13/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
April 2, 2018 2 (DISREGARD and Refer To 4 Amended Summons Issued) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Edmund G. Brown, Jr., California State Lands Commission, State of California* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Eric Grant* *Environment and Natural Resources Division, U.S. Dept of Justice* *950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Room 2611* *Washington, DC 20530*. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 4/2/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
April 2, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grant, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Eric Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: John William Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John William Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Lands Commission
Represented By: John William Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?