United States of America v. Real Property located at 4343 North Forty, Lincoln, California, Placer County, APN: 031-310-028-000 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property located at 4343 North Forty, Lincoln, California, Placer County, APN: 031-310-028-000, Real Property located at 1 Rancho Torre Court, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 040-0190-055-0000, Real Property located at 13373 Bennett Road, Herald, California,, Real Property located at 211 Hebron Circle, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 225-1590-086-0000, Real Property located at 4909 Winamac Drive, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 225-1800-056-0000, Real Property located at 5371 Ontario Street, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 023-0275-015-0000, Real Property located at 7471 53rd Avenue, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 040-0240-051-0000 and Real Property located at 9217 Silverdale Court, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 121-0810-047-0000
Case Number: 2:2018cv00808
Filed: April 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/7/2019 APPROVING 67 Stipulation. Claimant's 20 claim and 34 answer are hereby DEEMED WITHDRAWN. Claimant Khoi D Vo is hereby DEEMED DISMISSED from the above-captioned case. (York, M)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/3/19 APPROVING 64 Stipulation and Proposed Order; DEEMING 15 Claim and 16 Answer WITHDRAWN; and DISMISSING claimant from the case. Pensco Trust Company, Inc. terminated. (Coll, A)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/9/2019 DEEMED WITHDRAWN 26 Claimants' claim, and 35 Claimants' Answer. DISMISSING Claimants Stephen M. Ward, Pensco Trust Company and Debra L. Ward. (Reader, L)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/6/2018 ORDERING this matter STAYED until the resolution of companion criminal cases. The parties shall file a joint status report within 30 days of the conclusion of the parallel criminal cases, or as the court deems appropriate. CASE STAYED. (Zignago, K.)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION and ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/12/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property located at 4343 North Forty, Lincoln, California, Placer County, APN: 031-310-028-000 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 4343 North Forty, Lincoln, California, Placer County, APN: 031-310-028-000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 1 Rancho Torre Court, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 040-0190-055-0000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 13373 Bennett Road, Herald, California,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 211 Hebron Circle, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 225-1590-086-0000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 4909 Winamac Drive, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 225-1800-056-0000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 5371 Ontario Street, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 023-0275-015-0000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 7471 53rd Avenue, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 040-0240-051-0000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 9217 Silverdale Court, Sacramento, California, Sacramento County, APN: 121-0810-047-0000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?