Gibbs v. Bosenko

Petitioner: Robert A Gibbs
Respondent: Tom Bosenko
Case Number: 2:2018cv00859
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Referring Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 03/01/19 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/6/18 RECOMMENDING that 5 Motion for Injunctive Relief be Denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Coll, A)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/29/2018 VACATING the 6 findings and recommendations issued on 6/19/2018. This action is recharacterized as a prisoner civil rights action; the Clerk shall update the docket to reflect this act ion proceeds as a prisoner civil rights action under 42 U.S.C. § 1983; petitioner shall file a complaint within 30 days of the date of this order; and the Clerk shall forward to petitioner the court's form complaint for prisoner civil rights cases. (Yin, K)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/8/2018 RECOMMENDING petitioner's 1 petition for writ of habeas corpus be summarily dismissed and that all pending motions be denied as moot. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. Bosenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert A Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tom Bosenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?