Stribling v. Britton

Plaintiff: Aaron Lamont Stribling
Defendant: Britton
Case Number: 2:2018cv00870
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/13/2018 ADOPTING the 7 findings and recommendations in full. Plaintiff's 4 Motion to Proceed IFP is DENIED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the $400 filing fee within fourteen days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
May 3, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/2/2018 ORDERING Clerk to randomly assign a U.S. District Judge to this action and RECOMMENDING 4 Motion to Proceed IFP be denied and Plaintiff be ordered to pa y the $400 filing fee within 14 days from the date of any order adopting these findings and recommendations and be warned that failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
April 12, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/11/2018 ORDERING plaintiff has 30 days to submit either the filing fee or the application required by § 1915(a). The Clerk shall mail plaintiff an ifp application form.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stribling v. Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Lamont Stribling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?