Ortiz v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Yvette Ortiz
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc. and Credit One Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00877
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/13/2019 DISMISSING Experian Information Solutions Inc., pursuant to the stipulation of the Parties. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/9/19 DISMISSING Credit One Bank, N.A. with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/20/18 DISMISSING with prejudice defendant Equifax, Inc. only pursuant to 22 Stipulation. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (Benson, A.)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/15/2018 ORDERING that the deadline for Credit One to respond to the Complaint is CONTINUED to Monday, 5/28/2018. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Ortiz
Represented By: Elliot Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Erkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Le T. Duong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?